Original Case: 1:17-cv-05463

Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-01598
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 21, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
Bard Access Systems Inc.
Represented By
Natalie Helene Mantell
McCarter & English, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
3DT Holdings LLC
Represented By
Deanna L. Koestel
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/26/2022 4:19 AM EDT
Thursday, July 21, 2022
1 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant 3DT Holdings LLC, FILED. [3353652] 22-1598 [Entered: 07/25/2022 02:04 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax
Att: 2 27 pgs Case FILED
2 2 30+ pgs DISTRICT COURT FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, dated 06/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3353662] 22-1598 [Entered: 07/25/2022 02:08 PM]
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 06/24/2022, RECEIVED.[3353664] 22-1598 [Entered: 07/25/2022 02:10 PM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3353667] 22-1598 [Entered: 07/25/2022 02:11 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed
Att: 2 28 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED
5 5 PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant 3DT Holdings LLC, district court receipt # ANYSDC-26446316, FILED.[3353671] 22-1598 [Entered: 07/25/2022 02:13 PM]
Related: [-]