Original Case: 1:17-cv-00388

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-01641
Typecivil / private / diversity
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 26, 2022 3:19 AM CDT
Defendant
NATIONAL UNION FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY OF PITTSBURGH, PA
Defendant - Appellant Cross-Appellee
AMERICAN INTERNATIONAL SPECIALTY LINES INSURANCE CO., nka AIG Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Marilyn B. Rosen
Dentons
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
ALTICOR GLOBAL HOLDINGS INCORPORATED
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd
contact info
James D. Wilson I
Wilson Group Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
ALTICOR, INC.
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd
contact info
James D. Wilson I
Wilson Group Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
AMWAY CORPORATION
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd
contact info
James D. Wilson I
Wilson Group Law
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee Cross-Appellant
AMWAY INTERNATIONAL, INCORPORATED
Represented By
Matthew T. Nelson
Warner Norcross & Judd
contact info
James D. Wilson I
Wilson Group Law
contact info

GPO Aug 23 2024
UNPUBLISHED OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : The district court’s judgment in Amway’s favor is AFFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the cross-appeals—Nos. 22-1641 and 22-1679—are DISMISSED AS MOOT. Mandate to issue. Decision not for publication. Richard Allen Griffin (AUTHORING), John B. Nalbandian (CONCURRING IN PART & DISSENTING IN PART), and Andre B. Mathis, Circuit Judges. [22-1631, 22-1641, 22-1679]

Docket last updated: 07/26/2022 3:19 AM CDT
Monday, July 25, 2022
The case manager for this case is: Mr. Roy G. Ford (513) 564-7016 (RGF)
Related: [-]
2 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellees Cross-Appellants Alticor Global Holdings Incorporated, Alticor, Inc., Amway Corporation and Amway International, Incorporated. Transcript needed: y. (RGF)
Related: [-]