Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-10531
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2023 5:30 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MATTHEW RUPP
Represented By
TYLER C VAIL
Shunnarah Vail Trial Attorneys - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, February 20, 2023
4 4 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/20 11:33 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by MATTHEW RUPP. (VAIL, TYLER)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Thu 02/02 9:48 AM
ORDER - Despite the Court's warnings, the 609 plaintiffs identified in Exhibits A and B have more than one case filed on the active docket. The law firms representing these plaintiffs are directed to confer with one another and move to dismiss the case that is deemed to be the duplicate case within 21 days of the date of this Order. To the extent the law firms fail to dismiss the duplicate case by the deadline, the Court will dismiss the later filed case. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/1/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 07/28 3:40 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (VAIL, TYLER)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/26 8:37 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7338165.), filed by MATTHEW RUPP. (VAIL, TYLER)
Related: [-]