Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-10607
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2023 5:36 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
AARON ANDREW ARNOLD
Represented By
WILLIAM ROBERT SUTTON
Beasley Allen Crow Etc Pc - Montgomery Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file following the Eleventh Circuit's decision. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/15/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, March 10, 2023
4 4 motion Leave to File Document Fri 03/10 4:05 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by AARON ANDREW ARNOLD. (SUTTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/10 4:04 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by AARON ANDREW ARNOLD. (SUTTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 03/13 7:44 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/24/2023) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
2 2 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 07/26 3:58 PM
NOTICE of Designated Forum - United States District Court for the District of Wyoming by AARON ANDREW ARNOLD (SUTTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/26 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7340521.), filed by AARON ANDREW ARNOLD. (SUTTON, WILLIAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet