Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:P K Holmes III
Case #: 5:22-cv-05155
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Terminated:Nov 28, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2023 4:10 AM CST
Defendant
University of Arkansas
Represented By
C. Joseph Cordi, Jr.
University Of Arkansas
contact info
Plaintiff
Synetra Hughes
3443 W. Earnhardt
Fayetteville, AR 72704


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Tue 11/28 2:39 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Dismiss Case. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 28, 2023. (mjm)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response to Motion Tue 11/28 12:49 PM
RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by University of Arkansas. (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss Case Tue 11/28 7:30 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case by Synetra Hughes. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
20 20 order Order Cancelling Deadline Mon 11/27 2:25 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Cancelling Jury Trial set for 01/22/2024 and all deadlines related hereto. Jury Trial will be re-set at a later date. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 27, 2023. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Unredacted Document Tue 11/07 4:33 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. NOTICE OF FILING AN UNREDACTED DOCUMENT by University of Arkansas. The redacted document was previously filed as14 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Leave Tue 11/07 3:33 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting17 Motion for Leave to File Unredacted Transcript under Seal. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 7, 2023. (jch)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Leave Tue 11/07 3:23 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Transcript Under Seal by University of Arkansas. (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
16 16 26 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Tue 11/07 3:18 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by University of Arkansas. (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
15 15 msupport Statement of Facts Tue 11/07 3:17 PM
STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of14 MOTION for Summary Judgment by University of Arkansas. (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Summary Judgment Tue 11/07 3:15 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by University of Arkansas.(Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Exhibit,
Att: 23 Exhibit,
Att: 24 Exhibit,
Att: 25 Exhibit,
Att: 26 Exhibit,
Att: 27 Exhibit,
Att: 28 Exhibit,
Att: 29 Exhibit,
Att: 30 Exhibit,
Att: 31 Exhibit,
Att: 32 Exhibit,
Att: 33 Exhibit,
Att: 34 Exhibit,
Att: 35 Exhibit,
Att: 36 Exhibit,
Att: 37 Exhibit,
Att: 38 Exhibit,
Att: 39 Exhibit,
Att: 40 Exhibit,
Att: 41 Exhibit,
Att: 42 Exhibit,
Att: 43 Exhibit,
Att: 44 Exhibit,
Att: 45 Exhibit,
Att: 46 Exhibit,
Att: 47 Exhibit,
Att: 48 Exhibit,
Att: 49 Exhibit,
Att: 50 Exhibit,
Att: 51 Exhibit,
Att: 52 Exhibit,
Att: 53 Exhibit,
Att: 54 Exhibit,
Att: 55 Exhibit,
Att: 56 Exhibit,
Att: 57 Exhibit,
Att: 58 Exhibit,
Att: 59 Exhibit,
Att: 60 Exhibit,
Att: 61 Exhibit,
Att: 62 Exhibit,
Att: 63 Exhibit,
Att: 64 Exhibit,
Att: 65 Exhibit,
Att: 66 Exhibit,
Att: 67 Exhibit,
Att: 68 Exhibit,
Att: 69 Exhibit,
Att: 70 Exhibit
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
13 13 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 09/20 2:41 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re10 MOTION to Continue filed by Synetra Hughes. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
12 12 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 09/18 2:46 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER denying10 Motion to Continue. The Court finds that Dr. Hughes has had ample time to retain counsel and still has a meaningful opportunity to do so prior to trial. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 18, 2023. (ecp)
Related: [-]
11 11 respm Response to Motion Mon 09/18 12:53 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re10 MOTION to Continue filed by University of Arkansas.(Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
10 10 motion Continue Mon 09/18 8:48 AM
MOTION for Postponement of Trial by Synetra Hughes. (src)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 19, 2022
9 9 order Final Scheduling Order Mon 12/19 11:17 AM
FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 1/22/2024 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on December 19, 2022. (jas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 16, 2022
8 8 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 12/16 12:01 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by University of Arkansas. (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
7 7 order Initial Scheduling Order Mon 11/14 10:50 AM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/21/2022. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2023 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 14, 2022. (jas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/11 4:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by University of Arkansas.(Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/11 4:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by C. Joseph Cordi, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Cordi, C.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 10/28 7:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Synetra Hughes. University of Arkansas served on 10/27/2022, answer due 11/17/2022. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
3 3 notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Fri 07/29 2:04 PM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 8:24 AM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to University of Arkansas. Plaintiff provided copies at the counter. (bjb)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Received Thu 07/28 8:20 AM
Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 5007638. (bjb) Modified on 7/28/2022 (bjb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
utility Memo of Reassignment Wed 07/27 8:18 AM
TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Honorable Timothy L. Brooks no longer assigned to the case. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/26 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against University of Arkansas, filed by Synetra Hughes.(bjb)
Related: [-]