Washington Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas O Rice
Case #: 2:22-cv-00178
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause12:635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Terminated:Nov 29, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 22, 2023 2:32 AM PST
Defendant
Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
a Connecticut corporation One Tower Square
Hartford, CT 06183
Represented By
Thomas Ardell Larkin
Stewart Sokol & Larkin LLC
contact info
David John Guild, II
Sokol Larkin
contact info
Plaintiff
Jackson Contractor Group, Inc.
a Montana corporation 5800 US-93
Missoula, MT 59804
Represented By
Michael J Brandenberg
Dunn & Black Ps
contact info
Richard T Wetmore
Dunn & Black Ps
contact info
ThirdParty Defendant
Jeremy Bouchey
ThirdParty Defendant
Michael Bradley
ThirdParty Defendant
Kourtney Cassel
ThirdParty Defendant
Paul Cassel
ThirdParty Defendant
Cassel Unlimited, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
Delmar, LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
Flawless Walls LLC
ThirdParty Defendant
Jamie Gore
ThirdParty Defendant
JRoth, LLC
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By
Thomas Ardell Larkin
Stewart Sokol & Larkin LLC
contact info
David John Guild, II
Sokol Larkin
contact info

GPO Oct 28 2022
ORDER denying [ECF NO. 9] Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice.
GPO Jan 05 2024
ORDER denying 68 Third-Party Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice.

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 13, 2025
157 157 order Judgment Amended - Clerk Mon 01/13 4:56 PM
AMENDED JUDGMENT re149 Judgment, in favor of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America against Cassel Unlimited, LLC, Delmar, LLC, Flawless Walls LLC, JRoth, LLC, Jamie Gore, Jeremy Bouchey, Kourtney Cassel, Michael Bradley, Paul Cassel. (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.) (REM, Case Administrator)
Related: [-]
156 156 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Mon 01/13 4:47 PM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL ATTORNEYS' FEES (ECF No.150 ). This file is closed. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Rice. (REM, Case Administrator) (Service of Notice on parties not registered as users of the Court CM/ECF system accomplished via USPS mail.)
Related: [-]