Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-10643
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2023 4:36 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
HURLEY KING
215 ORLEANS STREET
BEAUMONT, TX 77701
Represented By
BRENT WAYNE COON
Brent Coon & Associates PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 04/05 9:13 AM
ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are GRANTED. Plaintiffs are instructed to file an amended complaint if they have not already done so. The Clerk is directed to update the docket accordingly. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/5/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, March 30, 2023
6 6 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/30 4:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by HURLEY KING. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/30 4:09 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by HURLEY KING. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 03/31 9:58 AM
Set Deadlines as to6 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/13/2023) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
4 4 16 pgs order Order Fri 01/20 9:18 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by February 8, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/18/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/28 2:20 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE TO FILER - Pursuant to N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 5.2, a complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet is required in each civil case filed. Please file the civil cover sheet, which can be obtained from the forms and publication at www.flnd.uscourts.gov (JS 44 (Rev. 06/17), using the event selection "Civil Cover Sheet" which is found under "Other Filings," "Other Documents." DE1 has the wrong pdg attached. In the future Open direct filed civil cases using the civil event "Complaint." DE2 will be corrected by the clerk. Re1 Complaint and2 Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only. (djb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
2 2 cmp Refiled Short Form Complaint - MDL cases only Wed 07/27 11:26 AM
REFILED SHORT FORM COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by HURLEY KING. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/27 11:24 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7342217.), filed by HURLEY KING. (COON, BRENT)
Related: [-]