Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:22-cv-02422
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2023 4:00 AM EST
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corp
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Defendant
3M Company, The
Plaintiff
Gary Hawkins
Represented By
Merritt E Cunningham
Stag Liuzza LLC
contact info
Michael G Stag
Stag Liuzza LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 26, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 07/26 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michael Stein, Neal Bell, James Catalano, Stephen Croxford, George Derk, Glenn Dietz, Wayne Gould, James K. Johnson, Flavio Jurado, David Key, John Mauldin, Walter Mikell, Luis Pedroza, James Randolph, Thomas Shores, Daniel Vaughan, Ronald Wagner, David Button, Gary Hawkins, Tena Tarver, Alan Dembroe Et al., James Winston, Joseph Arcuri, John Carr, Patrick Cornell, Terry Lee, Sr., Anthony Marchesani, Steven Partenheimer, Michael Sparks, Larry Van-Hook, William Bretherton, Donald Krumanacker, Gerald Beal, John Patch, Peter LeCompte , and Alan Dembroe, et al as to only plaintiffs Dion Burleson, Sean Gilchrist, David Hildreth, Gary Jackson, Donald Jones, Rhonda Knowles, William Maney, Philip Moffitt, Mark Molitor, Steven Passow, Nicholas Principe, Douglas Williams, Darryl Wright, Oliver Wright.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Cunningham, Merritt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, July 28, 2022
3 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/27/2022), Hawkins v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2422-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Maryland (Greenbelt Division) (sshe, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 1:56 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, )
Related: [-]
misc MDL Member Case Opened Thu 07/28 1:57 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed) (associated as of 7/27/2022), Hawkins v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-2422-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Maryland (Greenbelt Division) (sshe, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/28 1:56 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10612513.), filed by Gary Hawkins. Service due by 10/25/2022(sshe, )
Related: [-]