Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:David C Joseph
Referred: Carol B Whitehurst
Case #: 6:22-cv-02289
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:2671 Federal Tort Claims Act
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2022
Terminated:Jan 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2023 3:35 AM CST
Defendant
USA
Represented By
Desiree C Williams
U S Attorneys Office (laf)
contact info
Plaintiff
Neal Thierry
Represented By
Chuck D Granger
Granger Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Tue 02/20 2:37 PM
ORDER granting18 Joint Motion to Dismiss. IT IS ORDERED that this lawsuit and all claims asserted by Plaintiff, Neal Theirry, against Defendant, United States of America are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 2/20/2024. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Tue 02/20 8:18 AM
JOINT/VOLUNTARY MOTION to Dismiss by Neal Thierry, USA. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 2/20/2024.(aty,Granger, Chuck) Modified to add filer on 2/20/2024 (Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
17 17 order Judgment - Dismissal (30,60,90 day) Wed 01/03 1:05 PM
60 DAY JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL. IT IS ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED, without prejudice to the right, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days of the signing of this Order, to reopen the action if settlement is not consummated. The Clerk is now requested to close this case. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 1/3/2024. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Settlement Wed 01/03 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by All Parties. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
15 15 2 pgs order Order Thu 11/30 10:21 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER re14 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Neal Thierry. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 11/29/2023. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
14 14 motion Compel Bill of Costs Attorney Fees Mon 11/27 11:53 AM
MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents (Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/27/2023.), MOTION for Bill of Costs , MOTION for Attorney Fees by Neal Thierry. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst.(aty,Granger, Chuck)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate re efforts to resolve-LR 37.1,
Att: 2 Proposed order,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Written Discovery,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - USPS Return Receipt,
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Correspondence
notice Notice of Corrective Action Tue 11/28 8:54 AM
NOTICE of Corrective Action to Chuck D Granger on behalf of Neal Thierry regarding14 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents MOTION for Attorney Fees . Action taken: Modified entry to remove extra motion relief which was not applicable to the pleading filed. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Joseph Thu 05/04 4:33 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 5/13/2024 at 9:00 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 1 before Judge David C Joseph. Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2024 at 11:00 AM in chambers before Judge David C Joseph. Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings due by 9/27/2023. Plaintiffs Expert Info/Reports due by 9/27/2023. Defendants Expert Info/Reports due by 10/27/2023. Discovery deadline 11/27/2023. Dispositive Motions due by 12/26/2023. Daubert Motions due by 12/26/2023. Motions in Limine due by 3/25/2024. Pretrial Order due by 4/17/2024. Affirmation of Settlement Negotiations due 4/17/2024. Trial Depositions due by 4/17/2024. Bench Books due by 4/17/2024. Real Time glossary due by 4/17/2024. Signed by Judge David C Joseph on 5/4/2023. (crt,LaCombe, L)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 05/04 2:26 PM
MINUTES AND ORDER SETTING TRIAL for proceedings held on 5/4/2023 before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. IT IS ORDERED that a bench trial is SET on May 13, 2024, before Judge Joseph in Courtroom 1 in Lafayette. The pre-trial conference is SET on April 24, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. in chambers with Judge Joseph. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue a Scheduling Order setting forth the remaining pretrial deadlines in this case. (crt,Jordan, P)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Allowing Rule 26 Report Thu 05/04 10:50 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' Rule 26(f) Report, IT IS ORDERED that the report is found to be complete. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 5/4/2023. (crt,Blanke, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
10 10 misc Rule 26(f) Report Thu 04/27 3:50 PM
Joint RULE 26(f) Report by Neal Thierry and USA . (aty,Granger, Chuck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
9 9 order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Thu 04/06 10:06 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The telephone scheduling conference set for April 13 is hereby RE-SET for May 4, 2023 at 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26(f) report into the record on or before April 27, 2023. During the teleconference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Courts consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates. The parties will join the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1839 and entering access code 2869540. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/6/2023. (crt,Coreil, H)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
8 8 order Order Wed 04/05 10:09 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER A Scheduling Conference is set for April 13, 2023 at 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. In preparation for the teleconference, the parties shall exchange initial disclosures and file a joint Rule 26(f) report into the record on or before April 10, 2023. During the teleconference, the parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of the case, any issues requiring the Court's consideration, and the scheduling of pretrial conference and trial dates. The parties will join the teleconference by dialing 877-336-1839 and entering access code 2869540. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 4/5/2023. (crt,Blanke, S)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/06 8:52 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 4/13/2023 10:30 AM by phone before Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Jordan, P)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/01 7:06 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by USA.(aty,Williams, Desiree)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 12/12 4:00 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent . USA answer due 1/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 12/12/2022. (crt,Chavis, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 09, 2022
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 12/09 4:54 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, with consent by USA. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/9/2022.(Attorney Desiree C Williams added to party USA(pty:dft))(aty,Williams, Desiree)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
Wednesday, September 21, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed as to USA Wed 09/21 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Neal Thierry USA served on 9/20/2022, answer due 11/21/2022. (aty,Granger, Chuck)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued - USA (Form Included) Thu 07/28 11:08 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to U S Attorney, U S Attorney General. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 07/28 9:57 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Neal Thierry. (aty,Granger, Chuck)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 07/27 2:39 PM
COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5191485) filed by Neal Thierry.(Attorney Chuck D Granger added to party Neal Thierry(pty:pla))(aty,Granger, Chuck)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 07/28 9:56 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]