California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward J Davila
Referred: Susan Van Keulen
Case #: 5:22-cv-04325
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jan 23, 2023 1:41 AM PST
Amicus
State of North Carolina
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Illinois
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Idaho
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Hawaii
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Delaware
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Connecticut
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of California
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Alaska
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Nevada
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of New Jersey
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of New Mexico
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Maryland
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of New York
Office of Attorney General 28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of North Dakota
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Oregon
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
District of Columbia
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
Commonwealth of Massachusetts
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Rhode Island
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Utah
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Washington
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
Territory of Guam
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Minnesota
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Mississippi
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Montana
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Amicus
State of Nebraska
Represented By
Henry Bluestone Smith
Nys Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Lululemon Athletica, Inc.
Represented By
Adam R. Fox
Squire Patton Boggs (us) LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mark Zuckerberg
Defendant
Within Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher J. Cox
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Jonathan Elsasser
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Daniel Tyler Mader
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Jamie Lee
Columbia Square
contact info
Joseph Taylor Spoerl
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Eric Richard Sega
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Lauren Battaglia
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Benjamin Frederick Holt
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Christopher Fitzpatrick
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Logan Michael Breed
Hogan Lovells
contact info
Liam Phibbs
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Charles A. Loughlin
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Meta Platforms Inc.,
Represented By
Bambo Obaro
Weil, Gotshal And Manges
contact info
Molly Maureen Jennings
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Julius Taranto
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Ana Nikolic Paul
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Michael Moiseyev
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Alex Atticus Parkinson
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel And Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Geoffrey M. Klineberg
contact info
Jeffrey H. Perry
Weil, Gotshal & Manges
contact info
Evan Todd Leo
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Diane P. Sullivan
Weil, Gotshal And Manges LLP
contact info
Jacob Edwin Hartman
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel And Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Kimberly Varadi Hamlett
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Sonal N. Mehta
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale And Dorr LLP
contact info
Eric S. Hochstadt
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Hannah Carlin
Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel And Frederick PLLC
contact info
Li Wei Vivian Dong
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Chantale Fiebig
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
James M. Webster, III
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Daniel G. Bird
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel And Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Aaron M. Panner
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel And Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Samuel A Martin
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, PLLC
contact info
Collin R. White
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Mark C. Hansen
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Elizabeth Y Ryan
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Jared Beim
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Interested Party
virZOOM, Inc.
Represented By
Noah J. Kaufman
Morgan Lewis & Bockius
contact info
Amar Shrinivas Naik
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Varjo Technologies US, Inc.,
Represented By
Russell P. Cohen
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Peloton Interactive, Inc.
Represented By
Naomi Ariel Igra
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Benjamin Robert Nagin
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Nike, Inc.
Represented By
Diane McGimsey
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Apple Inc.
Represented By
Steven C. Sunshine
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Evan R Kreiner
contact info
Caroline W Van Ness
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher And Flom LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Alphabet Inc.
Represented By
Christina M. Wong
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Marisa Dieken
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Kayleigh Golish
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Mark H. Hamer
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Creighton J. Macy
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC
Sony Interactive Entertainment LLC 2207 Bridgepointe Parkway
San Mateo, CA 95833
Represented By
Everett Coraor
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Ye Eun E Chun
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
HTC America, Inc.
Represented By
David P. Chiappetta
Perkins Coie LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Equinox Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Mark S. Posard
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
EQUINOX MEDIA LLC
Represented By
Mark S. Posard
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
ByteDance Inc.
ByteDance Inc. 1920 Olympic Blvd
Santa Monica, CA 90404
Represented By
Craig Matthew Reiser
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP
contact info
Tiffany Rider Rohrbaugh
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP
contact info
Jason Tsuyoshi Murata
Axinn Veltrop & Harkrider, LLP
contact info
Miscellaneous
Valve Corporation
Represented By
Meeghan Tirtasaputra
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Movant
Forte Nexus, Inc.
Represented By
Eric E Reed
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Federal Trade Commission
Represented By
Justin Epner
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Sean Hughto
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Abby Lauren Dennis
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Ernest Eric Elmore
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Susan Musser
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
James Harris Weingarten
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Joshua M. Goodman
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Jeanine Balbach
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Anthony Saunders
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Timothy Patrick Singer
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Frances Anne Johnson
U.S. Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Erika Meyers
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Adam Michael Pergament
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Peggy Femenella
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Andrew Lowdon
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Bradley Dax Grossman
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Erika Ruth Wodinsky
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Michael Barnett
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Lincoln Mayer
Federal Trade Commission
contact info
Kristian Rogers
Federal Trade Commission
contact info

GPO Jul 28 2022
Order granting 13 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on July 28, 2022.(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022)
GPO Nov 02 2022
Order Granting In Part 89 MOTION to Strike DEFENDANTS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/2/2022.(ejdlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2022)
GPO Nov 04 2022
Order re 139 Discovery Dispute re Defendant's Subpoena to Apple. Signed by Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. (vkdlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2022)
GPO Dec 09 2022
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 280 Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Third-Party Witnesses. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/9/2022. (mdllc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2022)
GPO Dec 13 2023
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/31/2023. (Final Redacted Public Version re 546 Sealed Order). (crr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2023)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
571 571 order Judgment 1 - Terminate Deadlines Wed 12/13 6:06 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/13/2023. (crr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
570 570 65 pgs order Order Wed 12/13 5:18 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 1/31/2023. (Final Redacted Public Version re 546 Sealed Order). (crr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]