Iowa Southern District Court
Case #: 4:22-mj-00491
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Terminated:Aug 01, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jul 28, 2022 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Kiernan Major (1)
Represented By
Melanie S. Keiper
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
MacKenzie Benson Tubbs
United States Attorney'S Office - Dsm
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/31/2025 10:12 AM CDT
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
Arrest (Rule 5.c.3) of Kiernan Major from charges pending in District of Central District of California. (pll)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Kiernan Major from the Central District of California. (pll)
Related: [-]
2 2 Sealed Arrest Warrant as to Kiernan Major. (pll)
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ORDER as to Kiernan Major. Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3) set for 7/27/2022 at 03:00 PM in Des Moines - Room 455 - 4th Floor South via Video Proceeding to the Polk County Jail before Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ross A Walters(R) on 7/26/2022. (k)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE MacKenzie Benson Tubbs appearing for USA. (Tubbs, MacKenzie)
Related: [-]