New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00343
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jul 28, 2022 3:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Tae Jung Kim (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Amber Zuckerwise
Doj-Usao
contact info
John Vagelatos
United States Attorneys Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/28/2022 3:56 AM EDT
Monday, January 31, 2022
1 1 19 pgs SEALED COMPLAINT AND AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FORARREST WARRANT as to Tae Jung Kim (1). Signed by Judge Cheryl Pollak dtd 1/31/22. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak: for anArraignment as to Tae Jung Kim (1) Count Complaint held on 2/1/2022, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Tae Jung Kim held on 2/1/2022, Initial Appearance as to Tae Jung Kim held on 2/1/2022. AUSA John Vagelatos; Retained : Nat Dembin; Pretrial Officer Jada Gross and CJ. Korean Interpreter Fran Yoon. Both parties agree that the defendant can be released on certain bond conditions as stated on the record. The Court agreed and set a bond in the amount of $150,000.00 with $50,000. in cash to be posted or property to be posted with a value over $50,000. to be posted by 2 8-2022 1 Surety is to sign the bond by 2 8-2022 The defendant was sworn and advised of the bond conditions and agreed to abide by them. The defendant was released Brady Act ordered on the record. An order of excludable delay was verbally entered, excluding time from 2 1-2022 thru 04 02-2022 (FTR Log #4:36-5:31.) (Sica, Michele) Modified on 2/3/2022 (Sica, Michele). [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order to Unseal Case as to Tae Jung Kim.. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/1/2022. (Sica, Michele) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER: This order is entered pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) to confirm the prosecution's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. as to Tae Jung Kim. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/1/2022. (Sica, Michele) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tae Jung Kim (1) 150,000. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/1/2022. (Sica, Michele) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Tae Jung Kim (1) $150,000. One surety sworn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/8/2022. (Hugh, Lewis) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
Minute Entry for Bond Signing before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr: AUSA John Vagelatos for Government; Retained counsel Nat Dembin for Defendant. One surety sworn, advised of bond obligations, and permits Court to sign on her behalf. (Hugh, Lewis) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
7 7 REDACTION by Tae Jung Kim to6 1 - Sealed Document CR, Order Setting Conditions of Release (Hugh, Lewis) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Laura Amber Zuckerwise appearing for USA. (Zuckerwise, Laura) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 01, 2022
9 9 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tae Jung Kim Time excluded from 4/2/2022 until 5/2/2022.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 4/1/2022. (Yuen, Sui-May) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 02, 2022
10 10 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tae Jung Kim Time excluded from 5/2/22 until 6/3/22. Ordered by Chief Magistrate Cheryl L. Pollak on 5/2/2022. (Chin, Felix) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
11 11 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tae Jung Kim Time excluded from 6/17/22 until 7/17/22. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/16/2022. (Chin, Felix) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
12 12 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Tae Jung Kim Time excluded from 7/17/22 until 8/17/22.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Marcia M. Henry on 7/15/2022. (Sica, Michele) [1:22-mj-00089-CLP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
13 13 NOTICE of Intent to proceed under FRCrP 7(b) as to Tae Jung Kim (Marziliano, August)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Criminal Information Sheet