New York Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00345
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Jul 28, 2022 3:30 AM EDT
Defendant
Kiera Sade McPherson (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael R Maffei
Us Attorney'S Office/edny
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/28/2022 4:06 AM EDT
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
1 1 CONSENT TO TRANSFER JURISDICTION (Rule 20) from Western District of Oklahoma by Kiera Sade McPherson. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Indictment from the Western District of Oklahoma,
Att: 2 Docket Sheet from the Western District of Oklahoma,
Att: 3 Criminal Information Sheet
2 2 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Lee G. Dunst as to Kiera Sade McPherson for the purposes of conducting arraignments and bail hearings. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/27/2022. (Ortiz, Grisel)
Related: [-]