New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Douglas E Arpert
Case #: 3:22-cv-04786
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1346 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Mar 23, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2023 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.
Represented By
EDWARD ANTHONY VELKY
Bressler, Amery & Ross, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
SJG PARTNERS, LP
Represented By
MICHAEL R. O'DONNELL
Riker Danzig LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 23, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Thu 03/23 11:49 AM
STIPULATION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice and without costs. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/23/2023. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Wed 03/22 9:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SJG PARTNERS, LP. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
16 16 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 03/16 1:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting15 letter request and adjourning the Initial Conference to 4/5/2023 at 11:30 AM. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/16/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Thu 03/16 11:29 AM
Letter from Michael R. O'Donnell, Esq.. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
14 14 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/21 5:43 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting13 letter request and adjourning the Initial Conference to 3/16/2023 at 2:30 PM, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/21/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Letter Tue 02/21 12:49 PM
Letter from Michael R. O'Donnell, Esq.. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
12 12 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/25 5:28 PM
TEXT ORDER: Granting11 letter request and adjourning the Initial Conference to 2/22/2023 at 2:00 PM, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/25/2023. (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
11 11 misc Letter Mon 01/23 5:37 PM
Letter from Michael R. O'Donnell, Esq.. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
10 10 discov Joint Discovery Plan Fri 01/20 12:06 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by SJG PARTNERS, LP.(O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 27, 2022
9 9 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 12/27 9:53 AM
TEXT ORDER: Ordered the Initial Conference is set for 1/26/2023 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert, via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/27/2022. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) (eh, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 21, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 11/21 7:42 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC..(VELKY, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
7 7 order Stipulation and Order Wed 10/26 4:35 PM
STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER extending Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint until 11/21/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/26/2022. (jdg)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 10/26 2:06 PM
STIPULATION and Consent Order Extending Time to Answer by CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.. (VELKY, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/26 2:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD ANTHONY VELKY on behalf of CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. (VELKY, EDWARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/03 2:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC., filed by SJG PARTNERS, LP.(O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 08/03 1:58 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by SJG PARTNERS, LP. (O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 07/28 12:54 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (kht)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 07/28 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT against CITIZENS FINANCIAL GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13592638) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SJG PARTNERS, LP.(O'DONNELL, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Thu 07/28 11:36 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 07/28 12:47 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (kht)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement Thu 07/28 12:52 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (kht)
Related: [-]