Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-10711
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 6:27 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
MILTON JAMES MOSLEY
Represented By
GERARDO L GUERRA
Onderlaw Llc - St Louis Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, March 17, 2023
6 6 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/17 3:32 PM
ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file following the Eleventh Circuits decision. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/17/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/17 12:58 PM
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand against 3M COMPANY, filed by MILTON JAMES MOSLEY. (GUERRA, GERARDO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 03/16 3:12 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand against 3M COMPANY, filed by MILTON JAMES MOSLEY. (GUERRA, GERARDO)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend Thu 03/16 3:11 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand by MILTON JAMES MOSLEY. (GUERRA, GERARDO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 07/28 12:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (GUERRA, GERARDO)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/28 12:50 PM
COMPLAINT Short Form Complaint and Jury Trial Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7344849.), filed by MILTON JAMES MOSLEY. (GUERRA, GERARDO)
Related: [-]