Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodney Smith
Case #: 0:22-cv-61409
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:0551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Dec 20, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2023 4:06 AM EST
Defendant
Director US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Defendant
District Director Region 9, Miami District Office US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Field Office Director of Oakland Park Field Office, US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Defendant
Secretary Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Defendant
US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Yves Elismon
Represented By
Ruth Jean
Jean Law Group LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, December 20, 2022
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 12/20 3:09 PM
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 08, 2022
11 11 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 12/09 7:22 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/16/2022. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 12/8/2022. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
10 10 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 08/05 8:58 AM
Summons Issued as to Director US Citizenship and Immigration Services, District Director Region 9, Miami District Office US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director of Oakland Park Field Office, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary Department of Homeland Security, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (cqs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
9 9 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Thu 08/04 8:39 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Yves Elismon (Jean, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s) Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Summon(s) Proposed Summons,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Proposed Summons,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Proposed Summons
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
order Clerk's Notice to Filer - ELECTRONIC CASE, SUMMONS(ES) Wed 08/03 7:26 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents. Filer may file a Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) with the corrected summons attached.( Names must Match the party i.e. District Director Region 9, Miami District Office US Citizenship and Immigration ServicesLinda Swacina, in her official capacity) (cqs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/02 4:20 PM
NOTICE by Yves Elismon Summons (Jean, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/02 4:16 PM
NOTICE by Yves Elismon Lassen Summons (Jean, Ruth)
Related: [-]
utility Remark Tue 08/02 3:15 PM
Remark the INS attorney was added for Defendants (swr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/29 1:31 PM
NOTICE by Yves Elismon Civil Cover Sheet (Jean, Ruth)
Related: [-]
order Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction - ELECTRONIC CASE Fri 07/29 10:40 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (swr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
1 1 cmp Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus Thu 07/28 6:28 PM
Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Mandamus and under the Administrative Procedure Act against All Defendants. Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15828925, filed by Yves Elismon. Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Jean, Ruth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exh A. Receipts for Notice of Action,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. B Biometrics Notice,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. C Status Inquiry Responses
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 07/29 10:40 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (swr)
Related: [-]