Richard Wingert v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Maria A Audero |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-05256 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 25, 2023 12:31 AM PST |
Defendant
Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Wingert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/10/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
order
Dismissing Case
Tue 04/25 11:48 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation29 , the action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. (gk) |
|
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
stip
Dismiss Case
Mon 04/17 3:05 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Wang, Jenny) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 04/11 1:47 PM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee: In light of Plaintiff's Notice of Settlement27 , indicating that the case has settled in its entirety and that the parties are finalizing their written settlement agreement, this action is placed in inactive status. By 6/7/2023, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of 6/8/2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party to this action. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Friday, April 07, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Settlement
Fri 04/07 2:21 PM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Report
Tue 03/14 9:01 AM
UPDATED JOINT REPORT of Mediation filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wang, Jenny) |
|
Wednesday, March 08, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Report
Wed 03/08 11:54 AM
JOINT REPORT of re Mediation filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wang, Jenny) |
|
Friday, January 20, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Report
Fri 01/20 12:00 PM
JOINT REPORT of MEDIATION filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Wang, Jenny) |
|
Wednesday, December 07, 2022 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Wed 12/07 4:17 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. Counsel are directed to contact the private mediator of their choice to arrange a date and time for the mediation. The ADR proceeding is to be completed by: 1-20-23(early mediation); 4-3-23. The parties shall file a joint report no later than seven (7) days after the ADR proceeding regarding the progress of settlement discussions. Joint status report re settlement due by: 1-27-23 (joint report re results of early mediation); 4-10-23. (lom) |
|
22 | 22
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Wed 12/07 4:10 PM
SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE COURT TRIAL by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Bench Trial set for 8/29/2023 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (FPTC) - waived. (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates - Court Trial | ||
Wednesday, November 02, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 11/02 12:04 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on November 11, 2022. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) |
|
Thursday, October 27, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 3 - (ADR-1)
Thu 10/27 12:59 PM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 3. Parties request for private mediation. Filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert(Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order -Referral to Private ADR | ||
19 | 19
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Thu 10/27 12:56 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1/2 day, filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert.. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 09/27 11:52 AM
Notice of Court's Order setting Scheduling Conference filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
Monday, September 26, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Mon 09/26 4:21 PM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 11/11/2022 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) |
|
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/23 9:49 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company identifying The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Wang, Jenny) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 09/23 9:47 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Wang, Jenny) |
|
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 09/12 10:33 AM
Notice of Court's Orders filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
Friday, August 19, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 08/19 4:48 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer now due 9/23/2022, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Attorney Jenny H. Wang added to party Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Wang, Jenny) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 08/08 11:26 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert, upon Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 8/5/2022, answer due 8/26/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 08/05 11:44 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) |
|
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 08/05 10:08 AM
MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassign Pursuant to General Order 21-01 filed on 8/3/2022. The case number will now read CV 22-5256 DMG (MAAx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 21-01 (CV-52)
Wed 08/03 4:20 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:22-cv-05256 DMG(MAAx). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Tue 08/02 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:22-cv-05256-ODW (MAAx). (et) |
|
Monday, August 01, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Mon 08/01 6:10 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 08/01 2:09 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (car) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Mon 08/01 2:04 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car) |
|
Att: 1 CV11-C | ||
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Fri 07/29 9:26 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Fri 07/29 9:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert. (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 07/29 9:25 AM
Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert, (Grabarsky, Susan) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 07/29 9:21 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33717370 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Richard Wingert. (Attorney Susan B Grabarsky added to party Richard Wingert(pty:pla))(Grabarsky, Susan) |