Consolidated
Lead case: 3:16-md-02741

California Northern District Court
Judge:Vince Chhabria
Case #: 3:22-cv-04400
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Case in other court:Louisiana Eastern, 2:22-cv-02118
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 25, 2023 1:28 AM PST
Defendant
Monsanto Company
Represented By
Jennise Walker-Stubbs
Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Taylor
Represented By
Allan Berger
Allan Berger & Associates, P.L.C.
contact info
Andrew J. Geiger
Allan Berger & Associates, P.L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
13 13 8 pgs order Order Tue 05/21 4:21 PM
ORDER ENFORCING PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 240. Signed by Judge Vince Chhabria on 5/21/2024. Associated Cases: See Order. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Administrative Motion per Civil Local Rule 7-11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 03/20 11:08 AM
ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO MOVE CASES TO LATER WAVES. Associated Cases: 3:16-md-02741-VC, 3:17-cv-03202-VC, 3:19-cv-07533-VC, 3:20-cv-07322-VC, 3:21-cv-01214-VC, 3:22-cv-01229-VC, 3:22-cv-03140-VC, 3:22-cv-03830-VC, 3:22-cv-04400-VC, 3:22-cv-04406-VC, 3:22-cv-05047-VC. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
11 11 oth_sup Statement of Non-Opposition Tue 02/27 11:36 AM
Statement of Non-Opposition Move Case to Wave VII filed byMarilyn Taylor.(Berger, Allan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 30, 2022
10 10 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 08/30 8:21 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Marilyn Taylor] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 08/30 8:20 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Other Affiliate Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. [RE: Plaintiff Marilyn Taylor] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/30 8:19 AM
Defendant Monsanto Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [RE: Plaintiff Marilyn Taylor] byMonsanto Company. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/09 11:30 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marilyn Taylor. Monsanto Company served on 8/3/2022, answer due 8/24/2022. (Berger, Allan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 07/29 12:35 PM
Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-02118. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
utility MDL Member Case Fri 07/29 12:37 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:16-md-02741, Eastern Louisiana, 2:22-cv-02118, Taylor v. Monsanto Company, Opened in California Northern District as 22-cv-4400 VC pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 342 cc: JPMDL (lsk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 25, 2022
5 5 Order of MDL Transfer to the Northern District of California. MDL case number is 2741. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(jls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter
Thursday, July 21, 2022
4 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2741. (jls)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
3 3 Summons Issued as to Monsanto Company. (jls)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
2 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Monsanto Company (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9440044) filed by Marilyn Taylor.Attorney Andrew J. Geiger added to party Marilyn Taylor(pty:pla).(Geiger, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons