NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC et al v. BARLOW et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-02247 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 29, 2022 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 25, 2023 4:13 AM EST |
Defendant
ABIGAIL BARLOW
|
|
Defendant
BARLOW & BEAR, LLC
|
|
Defendant
EMILY BEAR
|
|
Defendant
PINK & PURPLE LADY, INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, September 23, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
misc
Report Regarding Copyright
Fri 09/23 8:09 PM
REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright.. (Ehler, Rose) |
|
15 | 15
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 09/23 8:00 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Ehler, Rose) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/12 1:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER construing the14 Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint as a consent motion for extension of time and granting it. Defendants currently have until August 23, 2022, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint. See ECF No. 14 at 1. The parties have filed a14 Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendants' Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint, in which they "STIPULATE, and respectfully request that the Court enter an Order providing, that [Defendants'] deadline [to] answer or otherwise respond to [Plaintiffs'] Complaint" is extended to September 22, 2022. Extensions of time will "be granted only upon motion and not upon stipulation of the parties." See ECF No. 7 ¶ 10. But because the parties request a Court Order granting the requested extension, the Court construes the14 Joint Stipulation as a consent motion for extension of time. So construed, it is hereby ORDERED, for good cause shown, that the14 consent motion for extension of time is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by September 22, 2022. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/12/2022. (lctjk2) |
||
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Thu 08/11 6:15 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC.(Ehler, Rose) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/10 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Grace Fisher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Fisher, Virginia) |
|
Tuesday, August 09, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/09 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Leda Ehler on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Ehler, Rose) |
|
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/05 10:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Virginia Grace Davis. Virginia Grace Davis is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/05/2022. (lctjk2) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/05 10:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs'9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Rose Leda Ehler. Rose Leda Ehler is hereby admitted pro hac vice in this matter to appear for Plaintiffs. Counsel should register for e-filing via PACER and file a notice of appearance pursuant to LCvR 83.6(a). [LINK:Click for instructions] . Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/05/2022. (lctjk2) |
||
Thursday, August 04, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 08/04 11:39 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BARLOW & BEAR, LLC served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022; EMILY BEAR served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 (Anders, Ginger) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 08/04 11:38 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ABIGAIL BARLOW served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022; PINK & PURPLE LADY, INC. served on 8/2/2022, answer due 8/23/2022 (Anders, Ginger) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/04 11:29 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Rose Leda Ehler, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9418321. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC.(Anders, Ginger) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/04 11:26 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Virginia Grace Davis, Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ADCDC-9418292. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC.(Anders, Ginger) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
Standing Order
Tue 08/02 6:57 PM
STANDING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 08/02/2022. (lctjk2) |
|
6 | 6
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/02 4:24 PM
Case randomly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Errata
Tue 08/02 3:38 PM
ERRATA by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC re Notice of QC- New Case,.(Anders, Ginger) |
|
Att: 1 Cover | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 08/02 11:31 AM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmrl) |
|
3 | 3
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Tue 08/02 9:20 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC, NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC (Anders, Ginger) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 08/02 11:10 AM
Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zmrl) |
||
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Tue 08/02 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to ginger.anders@mto.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Noncompliance with LCvR 5.1(c). Please file an errata correcting the initiating pleading to include the name & full residence address of each party using the event Errata., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zmrl, ) |
||
Friday, July 29, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/29 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ginger Dawn Anders on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Anders, Ginger) |
|
1 | 1
25
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/29 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9406470) filed by NETFLIX WORLDWIDE ENTERTAINMENT, LLC, NETFLIX STUDIOS, LLC.(Anders, Ginger) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Supplement REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT |