Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:22-cv-10786
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 5:26 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
INDIRA RAQUELA BEDASIE
Represented By
JON COLLINS CONLIN
Cory Watson Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
4 4 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Tue 04/11 12:03 PM
ORDER. re 3 MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT. The motions identified on Exhibit A are GRANTED. Plaintiffs are instructed to file an amended complaint if they have not already done so. The Clerk is directed to update the docket accordingly. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 04/11/2023. AEARO LLC, AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC, AEARO HOLDING LLC and AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC terminated. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
3 3 motion Leave to File Document Mon 04/10 10:38 AM
MOTION for Leave to File AMENDED COMPLAINT by INDIRA RAQUELA BEDASIE. (HUNT, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 04/10 10:37 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by INDIRA RAQUELA BEDASIE. (CONLIN, JON)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/29 1:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7347648.), filed by INDIRA RAQUELA BEDASIE. (CONLIN, JON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet