Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Janet S Baer
Case #: 1:22-bk-08592
Case Filed:Jul 29, 2022
Creditor Meeting:Aug 29, 2022

Debtor
P. J. Fazio Plumbing & Heating Inc
55 N Garden Ave
Roselle, IL 60172
Represented By
David H Cutler
Cutler & Associates, Ltd.
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Gina B Krol
Cohen & Krol 105 West Madison St Ste 1100
Chicago, IL 60602
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 07/30/2022 12:35 AM CDT
Friday, July 29, 2022
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7a) Fri 07/29 4:28 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual Fee Amount $338, Filed by David H Cutler on behalf of P. J. Fazio Plumbing & Heating Inc (Cutler, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Signature Pages
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Asset Corporation) Fri 07/29 5:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/29/2022 at 11:30 AM at Appear By VIDEO. See details at www.justice.gov/ust/file/ILN.pdf/download.. (Auto Assign, Admin)
Related: [-]