Arizona District Court
Judge:Jennifer G Zipps
Case #: 4:22-cv-00338
Nature of Suit510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentence
Case Filed:Jun 13, 2022
Terminated:Jan 13, 2023
Petitioner
Shateria Morse
Respondent
USA

GPO Jan 13 2023
ORDER that the Motion 2255 to Set Aside, Vacate, or Correct Sentence (Civ. Doc. 1 in CV-22-00338-TUC-JGZ; Crim. Doc. 215 in CR-20-00254-JGZ-BGM-1) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close its file in this action. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 1/13/2023. (MCO)
GPO Feb 02 2023
*ORDER denying 14 Motion for Certificate of Appealability re: Appeal 13. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/1/23. (See attached Order for complete details) (JAM) *Modified to correct linkage on 2/2/2023 (JAM).

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
17 17 appeal USCA Order Wed 11/22 4:07 PM
ORDER of USCA re:13 Notice of Appeal filed by Shateria Morse. The request for a certificate of appealability is denied because appellant has not made a "substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right." Any pending motions are denied as moot. DENIED. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Certificate of Appealability Thu 02/02 8:44 AM
*ORDER denying14 Motion for Certificate of Appealability re: Appeal13 . Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/1/23. (See attached Order for complete details) (JAM) *Modified to correct linkage on 2/2/2023 (JAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
15 15 appeal USCA Case Number Wed 02/01 2:01 PM
USCA Case Number re:13 Notice of Appeal. Case number 23-15116 Ninth Circuit. (BAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
14 14 motion Certificate of Appealability Tue 01/24 4:18 PM
MOTION for Certificate of Appealability by Shateria Morse.(Leon, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed order
13 13 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 01/24 4:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re:12 Clerks Judgment,11 Order, by Shateria Morse. (Leon, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
12 12 order Clerks Judgment Fri 01/13 12:30 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that in accordance with the Courts Order filed January 13, 2023, movant's motion pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255 to vacate, set aside or correct a sentence is denied and the civil action opened in connection is hereby dismissed with prejudice. (MCO)
Related: [-]
11 11 5 pgs order Order Fri 01/13 12:28 PM
ORDER that the Motion 2255 to Set Aside, Vacate, or Correct Sentence (Civ. Doc. 1 in CV 22-00338 TUC-JGZ; Crim. Doc. 215 in CR 20-00254 JGZ-BGM-1) is denied and dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and close its file in this action. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 1/13/2023. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
10 10 misc Supplement Wed 01/04 1:38 PM
SUPPLEMENT Second Supplement to 2255 by Petitioner Shateria Morse. (Leon, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 05, 2022
9 9 misc Supplement Mon 12/05 10:06 AM
SUPPLEMENT Supplement to Section 2255 Motion re:1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) by Petitioner Shateria Morse. (Leon, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
8 8 misc Reply to Response to Motion (2255) Tue 09/27 3:51 PM
REPLY TO7 Response to Motion (2255) . filed by Shateria Morse. (Leon, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2022
7 7 misc Response to Motion (2255) Tue 09/20 10:38 AM
RESPONSE TO1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) . filed by USA. (Russell, Craig)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 12, 2022
6 6 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Mon 09/12 8:03 AM
ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Expedite Response is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States shall file its answer to the Supplement to the § 2255 Motion (Doc.3 .) on or before 9/30/2022. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 9/9/2022. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
5 5 motion Expedite Fri 09/09 8:00 AM
First MOTION to Expedite Response to 2255 motion Unopposed by Shateria Morse.(Leon, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed order
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
4 4 order Service Order (2255) ~Util - Case No Longer Referred Tue 08/16 8:23 AM
Service Order (2255), IT IS ORDERED: The Clerk of Court must electronically serve a copy of the Supplement to the § 2255 Motion (Doc. 3 in CV 22-00338 TUC-JGZ) and this Order on the US Attorney for the District of AZ pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the US District Clerk of Court for the District of AZ and the US Attorney's Office for the District of AZ. Pursuant to the Memorandum of Understanding. The parties and the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the Motion and Supplement to the § 2255 Motion in the civil case. The US Attorney for the District of AZ or his designee has 60 days from the date of service within which to answer the Supplement to the § 2255 Motion. (See attached Order for complete details) Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 8/15/2022. (MCO)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
3 3 motion Vacate Tue 08/09 4:59 PM
First MOTION to Vacate by Shateria Morse. (Leon, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Assignment Fri 07/29 1:13 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MYE)
Related: [-]
1 1 mot2255 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) Fri 07/29 1:12 PM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) re: Criminal Case No CR 20-00254 TUC-JGZ(BGM)-1 filed by Shateria Morse. (3 pages)(MYE)
Related: [-]