Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:14-cv-01102
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2014
Terminated:Sep 30, 2016
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 1:12 AM CDT
Defendant
Centennial Centre LLC
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Fieldstone Investments LLC
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Lexington Homes Inc
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey T Marlow
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Ponds of Menasha LLC
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Michelle L Stimpson
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Tailwind Crossings LLC
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Team Stimpson LLC
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Defendant
Greg Wells
Represented By
Anthony J Steffek
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Christopher D Wolske
Menn Law Firm Ltd
contact info
Frank W Kowalkowski
Davis & Kuelthau Sc
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
ACUITY A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Christine M Rice
Simpson & Deardorff Sc
contact info
Intervenor Defendant
Acuity A Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Christine M Rice
Simpson & Deardorff Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Design Basics LLC
Represented By
Michael T Hopkins
Hopkins Mccarthy LLC
contact info
Dana A LeJune
Dana Andrew Lejune Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Plan Pros Inc
Represented By
Michael T Hopkins
Hopkins Mccarthy LLC
contact info
Dana A LeJune
Dana Andrew Lejune Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Prime Designs Inc
Represented By
Michael T Hopkins
Hopkins Mccarthy LLC
contact info
Dana A LeJune
Dana Andrew Lejune Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, August 23, 2017
138 138 misc Report Wed 08/23 11:08 AM
Copyright Report to Register of Copyrights. (cav)
Related: [-]