California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:22-cv-01318
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2022
Terminated:Aug 03, 2022
Defendant
Arreano
Defendant
Chavez
Defendant
Delgado
Defendant
J. Ellen
Defendant
Lopez
Defendant
Stewart
Plaintiff
Chanda Uy

GPO Aug 03 2022
ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1318 JDP PC) to Fresno (1:22-cv-0963 HBK PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/2/2022. (Yin, K)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/03 1:19 PM
ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:22-cv-1318 JDP PC) to Fresno (1:22-cv-0963 HBK PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 8/2/2022. (Yin, K)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 29, 2022
3 3 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Fri 07/29 12:12 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/26/2022*. Consent or Decline due by 9/1/2022. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Litigant Letter,
Att: 2 E-Filing Notice
service Service by Mail Fri 07/29 12:12 PM
SERVICE BY EMAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents served on Chanda Uy. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Fri 07/29 12:11 PM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Chanda Uy. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint Fri 07/29 12:10 PM
PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Chanda Uy. (Zignago, K.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet