USA v. The Premises Located at Sky Asian Massage and Spa, 952 AR-5 North, Suite #3, Benton, Arkansas 72019
Arkansas Eastern District Court | |
Case #: | 4:22-sw-00108 |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 31, 2022 2:23 AM CDT |
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
The Premises Located at Sky Asian Massage and Spa, 952 AR-5 North, Suite #3, Benton, Arkansas 72019 (1)
Terminated: 07/01/2022
|
Docket last updated: 07/31/2022 2:33 AM CDT |
Friday, July 01, 2022 | ||
Search and Seizure Warrant Issued in case as to Business [5 pages]. (lej) (fcd) | ||
1 | 1 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Business [7 pages]. (lej) (fcd) | |
2 | 2 ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal as to Business (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/1/2022. [1 page] (lej) (fcd) | |
3 | 3 Application and Affidavit for search warrant as to Business [36 pages]. (lej) (fcd) | |
4 | 4 Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed on 6/29/2022 in case as to Business [5 pages]. (lej) (fcd) |