Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Wendy W Berger
Referred: Robert M Norway
Case #: 6:22-cv-01353
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:0002(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 6:05 AM EST
Defendant
Goldelm At Charter Pointe, LLC
Represented By
Patricia Maria Rego Chapman
Dean, Ringers, Morgan & Lawton, PA
contact info
Douglas T. Noah
Dean, Ringers, Morgan & Lawton, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Felix M. Pagan
Represented By
Zandro E. Palma
The Law Offices Of Zandro E. Palma, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 05/09 3:40 PM
ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion for Entry of Order Approving Settlement and Dismissing Case With Prejudice; adopting 24 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 5/9/2023. (MDJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
24 24 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 03/23 2:57 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 22 Joint Motion for Settlement Approval. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway on 3/23/2023. (Norway, Robert)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 03/23 5:09 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: Pursuant to this Court's February 10, 2023 Standing Order, available at https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/sites/flmd/files/documents/flmd-berger-standing-order-on-objections-6-23-mc-4-wwb.pdf, objections to reports and recommendations shall not exceed fifteen pages and responses to objections shall not exceed ten pages. Failure to comply with the applicable guidelines set forth in the Standing Order may result in the striking of objections or responses without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/23/2023. (KSR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/09 8:34 AM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. New case number: 6:22-cv-1353-WWB-RMN. Magistrate Judge David A. Baker no longer assigned to the case. Motion(s) REFERRED:22 Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Norway. (GNB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
22 22 motion Settlement Wed 03/08 10:21 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Approval by Felix M. Pagan.(Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
order Order Tue 02/14 9:23 AM
ENDORSED ORDER: Based on the parties' Notice of Settlement (Doc. 20), they are ORDERED to file, by March 7, 2023, appropriate papers for the Court's consideration in determining whether to approve their resolution of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 2/14/2023. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
20 20 notice Notice of settlement Mon 02/13 11:29 AM
NOTICE of settlement by Felix M. Pagan (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 01/04 10:12 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 1/4/2023. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Tue 01/03 9:16 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO COURT INTERROGATORIES NUNC PRO TUNC by Felix M. Pagan. (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
17 17 respoth Answer to court interrogatories Tue 01/03 9:10 PM
ANSWER to court interrogatories re:14 Case Management Scheduling Order, by Felix M. Pagan. (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 06, 2022
16 16 notice Compliance notice Tue 12/06 2:12 PM
NOTICE of compliance re14 Case Management Scheduling Order, by Goldelm At Charter Pointe, LLC (Noah, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 02, 2022
15 15 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Fri 12/02 9:41 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Douglas T. Noah on behalf of Goldelm At Charter Pointe, LLC. Lead Counsel: Douglas T. Noah. (Noah, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
14 14 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Tue 11/15 1:38 PM
FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER: By 12/06/2022 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 01/24/2023 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 12/27/2022 Settlement Report due by 2/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 11/15/2022. (JW)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 11/15 8:24 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting, to the extent not moot, 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 11/15/2022. (Baker, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 14, 2022
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 11/14 9:29 AM
NOTICE to counsel Patricia M. Rego Chapman and Douglas T. Noah of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (KNC)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 11, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of appearance Fri 11/11 4:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Maria Rego Chapman on behalf of Goldelm At Charter Pointe, LLC Related [+]
Related: [-] go Chapman, Patricia
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/11 3:58 PM
Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Goldelm At Charter Pointe, LLC.(Noah, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 20, 2022
9 9 misc Response to order to show cause Thu 10/20 9:43 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re8 Order to show cause, filed by Felix M. Pagan. (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
8 8 2 pgs order Order to show cause Thu 10/06 4:16 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order why the complaint against Defendant should notbe dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Rules 1.10(d), 3.10. Failure to respond to this order may result in dismissal of the Defendant without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Baker on 10/6/2022. (JW)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of a Related Action Mon 08/08 4:47 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Felix M. Pagan. Related case(s): No (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/08 4:44 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Felix M. Pagan. (Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations Mon 08/01 3:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/1/2022. (RMF)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons issued Mon 08/01 9:32 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Goldelm At Charter Pointe, LLC. (KNC)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/01 7:56 AM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge David A. Baker. New case number: 6:22-cv-1353-WWB-DAB. (SJB)
Related: [-]
order *Order no pdf Mon 08/01 3:08 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 8/1/2022. (RMF)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 31, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 07/31 9:21 PM
COMPLAINT against Goldelm At Charter Pointe, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19829871) filed by Felix M. Pagan.(Palma, Zandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons