Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Eleanor L Ross
Case #: 1:22-cv-02998
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 28, 2022
Terminated:Jul 08, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 24, 2023 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Provide Technologies Inc.
Represented By
Robert Edward Buckley
Freeman Mathis & Gary, Llp -Atl
contact info
Leo Kogan
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Michael C. Mason
Interested Party
The Law Office of Michael C. Mason
Interested Party
Kyle Thomas
Plaintiff
Unibright Ventures GmBH
Represented By
Brian C. Bianco
Akerman Llp-Il
contact info
Julia R. Lissner
Julia Lissner
contact info
Jeremy Patrick Burnette
Akerman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Unibright IT GmbH
Represented By
Brian C. Bianco
Akerman Llp-Il
contact info
Julia R. Lissner
Julia Lissner
contact info
Jeremy Patrick Burnette
Akerman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
55 55 8 pgs misc Mail Returned Wed 09/18 12:13 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Provide Technologies Inc re53 Order and54 Clerk's Judgment. Insufficient Address/Unable to Forward (ajw)
Related: [-]