New Jersey District Court
Case #: 3:14-cr-00518
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2014

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



1. Man 'sold' Facebook IPO shares, gets 46 months in the federal slammer (venturebeat.com)
Submitted Thu 01/22/2015
Docket last updated: 01/22/2015 4:21 PM EST
Tuesday, September 09, 2014
Unsecured appearance Bond Entered as to FREDRICK TODD in amount of $ $100,000.00 with special conditions. (DS)
Related: [-]
1 1 INFORMATION as to FREDRICK TODD (1) count(s) 1 & 2. (DS)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by FREDRICK TODD (DS)
Related: [-]
3 3 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to FREDRICK TODD. (DS)
Related: [-]
4 4 PLEA AGREEMENT as to FREDRICK TODD. (DS)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to FREDRICK TODD (1) $100,000.00 unsecured appearance bond with special condition (Finance notified). Signed by Judge Joel A. Pisano on 09/09/2014. (DS)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joel A. Pisano: Initial Appearance/Plea Agreement Hearing as to FREDRICK TODD held on 9/9/2014; Plea entered by FREDRICK TODD (1) Counts 1 & 2; FREDRICK TODD (1) Guilty Counts 1 & 2. ( Sentencing set for 1/12/2015 at 10:00 AM in Trenton - Courtroom 1 before Judge Joel A. Pisano.). Bond Hearing as to FREDRICK TODD held on 9/9/2014. Bail set at $100,000.00 unsecured appearance bond with special conditions. Ordered Pre-sentence investigation report to be expedited. (Court Reporter: J. Caruso.) (DS)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: JAMES K. FILAN appearing for FREDRICK TODD. (DS)
Related: [-]