Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Case #: 3:22-cv-01673
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2022
Terminated:Nov 20, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 4:18 AM CST
Defendant
Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc
Represented By
Jamie Brod Ashton
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Shaina Elise Hicks
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Matthew Paul Gizzo
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Andrew T Turner
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jason Cloud
Represented By
Walker Green Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeff Collins
Represented By
Walker Green Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Linda Gorski
Represented By
Walker Green Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Harvey
Represented By
Walker Green Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Mathers
Represented By
Walker Green Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton
Represented By
Walker Green Harman, Jr.
The Harman Firm, LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2023
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court denies the 20 motion to compel, grants Plaintiffs' 21 motion for sanctions, and otherwise denies relief. The Court concludes that Cumulus's counsel's short-notice, unilateral cancellation of the deposition justifies imposing the costs of rescheduling on them. If the parties cannot agree, Plaintiffs shall submit a bill of costs. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/29/2023) (twd)

Docket last updated: 02/28/2024 11:59 PM CST
Monday, November 20, 2023
35 35 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 11/20 2:41 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion to Dismiss. This case is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. The parties will each bear their own attorneys' fees, expenses, and costs. This is a Final Judgment. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 11/20/2023) (cea)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 10, 2023
34 34 motion Dismiss Fri 11/10 3:52 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc (Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
33 33 1 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 10/11 7:52 AM
ORDER: The parties have announced that this case has been resolved. Any trial setting and scheduling order are vacated. The parties have thirty days to file dismissal papers. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 10/10/2023) (axm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 06, 2023
32 32 minutes Settlement Conference Wed 09/06 6:50 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: On this day, a settlement conference was conducted by Magistrate Judge Renée Harris Toliver. Plaintiffs appeared in person and through their attorneys of record, Evan Richardson and Walker Harmon, Jr. Defendant appeared through its representatives and by and through its attorney of record, Andrew Turner. THE CASE SETTLED . (Court Reporter: Not Recorded) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 8:10. (Toliver, Renée)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
31 31 5 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Tue 07/25 10:05 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 9/6/2023 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver on 7/25/2023) (agc) Modified text on 7/25/2023 (agc)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
30 30 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 06/26 4:28 PM
ORDER OF REFERENCE: The29 joint request for a settlement conference is granted. Under Authority of 28 U.S.C. §636(b), this case is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Renee Harris Toliver for a settlement conference to be set at the Court's convenience. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 6/26/2023) (twd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Thu 06/15 11:17 AM
Joint Request for Settlement Conference filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc (Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
28 28 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 06/14 9:21 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan Richardson on behalf of Jason Cloud. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Richardson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
27 27 7 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Wed 03/29 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court denies the20 motion to compel, grants Plaintiffs'21 motion for sanctions, and otherwise denies relief. The Court concludes that Cumulus's counsel's short-notice, unilateral cancellation of the deposition justifies imposing the costs of rescheduling on them. If the parties cannot agree, Plaintiffs shall submit a bill of costs. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 3/29/2023) (twd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
26 26 respm Reply Tue 02/28 6:56 PM
REPLY filed by Jason Cloud, Jeff Collins, Linda Gorski, David Harvey, Robert Mathers, Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton re:20 MOTION to Compel Deposition by a date certain (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Reply Tue 02/28 6:51 PM
REPLY filed by Jason Cloud, Jeff Collins, Linda Gorski, David Harvey, Robert Mathers, Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton re:21 MOTION for Sanctions for failure to produce a Defendant for a Deposition and for violating local rule 7.1 (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
24 24 respm Response/Objection Tue 02/14 3:18 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc re:20 MOTION to Compel Deposition by a date certain (Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) J,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) K,
Att: 12 Proposed Order
23 23 respm Response/Objection Tue 02/14 3:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc re:21 MOTION for Sanctions for failure to produce a Defendant for a Deposition and for violating local rule 7.1 (Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) J,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) K,
Att: 12 Proposed Order
Monday, February 06, 2023
22 22 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 02/06 11:05 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot17 Motion for Protective Order per the parties. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 2/6/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
21 21 motion Sanctions Tue 01/24 5:31 PM
MOTION for Sanctions for failure to produce a Defendant for a Deposition and for violating local rule 7.1 filed by Jason Cloud, Jeff Collins, Linda Gorski, David Harvey, Robert Mathers, Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Compel Tue 01/24 5:29 PM
MOTION to Compel Deposition by a date certain filed by Jason Cloud, Jeff Collins, Linda Gorski, David Harvey, Robert Mathers, Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 23, 2023
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 01/23 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew T Turner on behalf of Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Turner, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 20, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 01/20 1:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for one week docket beginning 1/29/2024 before Chief District Judge David C Godbey. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 1/20/2023) (oyh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
17 17 motion Protective Order Wed 01/18 8:33 AM
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order & TO QUASH DEPOSITION OF TODD MCCARTHY filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc (Ashton, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) J,
Att: 11 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 10/11 3:00 PM
ORDER granting15 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs' and Defendant's deadline to comply with the Initial Discovery Order for Employment Cases (Doc.10 ) is stayed pending mediation. The Court further ORDERS that in the event mediation is unsuccessful, the parties' deadline to comply with the Initial Discovery Order for Employment Cases is on or before December 27, 2022. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 10/11/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
15 15 motion Stay Fri 10/07 1:21 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay re10 Order Joint Motion to Stay Initial Discovery Order for Employment Cases Pending Early Mediation filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc (Ashton, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 26, 2022
14 14 misc Status Report Mon 09/26 12:40 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc. (Ashton, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
12 12 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/06 1:46 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Time to Comply with Initial Discovery Order for Employment Cases filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc (Ashton, Jamie)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 09/06 5:24 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting12 Motion to Extend Time. The parties must comply with the Initial Discovery Order by October 28, 2022. (Ordered by Chief Judge David C Godbey on 9/6/2022) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 29, 2022
11 11 order Protective Order Tue 08/30 8:36 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/29/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
10 10 8 pgs order Order Tue 08/30 8:35 AM
INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER FOR EMPLOYMENT CASES. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/29/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Tue 08/30 8:33 AM
ORDER REQUIRING STATUS AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are directed to confer within 14 days of the date of this Order regarding the following matters, and report to the Court within 14 days after the conference the parties' position. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 8/29/2022) (ndt)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 08/29 2:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Ashton, Jamie)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 08/29 2:16 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint, filed by Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Ashton, Jamie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Tue 08/16 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc ; served on 8/9/2022. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 08/08 11:37 AM
Summons Issued as to Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc. (axm)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Mon 08/08 10:35 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Jason Cloud, Jeff Collins, Linda Gorski, David Harvey, Robert Mathers, Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton. (Harman, Walker) (Main Document 4 replaced on 8/8/2022 to flatten pdf) (axm)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/08 9:38 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cumulus Media New Holdings Inc filed by Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton, David Harvey, Jason Cloud, Linda Gorski, Jeff Collins, Robert Mathers. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
2 2 qcref Godbey Tue 08/02 10:12 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (sxf)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/01 9:22 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Cumulus Media New Holdings, Inc. filed by Maryrose Zeilan-Hamilton, David Harvey, Jason Cloud, Linda Gorski, Jeff Collins, Robert Mathers. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-13002107) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Harman, Walker)
Related: [-]