Colorado District Court
Judge:William J Martinez
Referred: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Case #: 1:22-cv-01910
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause42:11603(b) - Int'l. Child Abduction Remedies Act (ICARA) -- Judicial Review
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2022
Terminated:Apr 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 3:08 AM MST
In Re
S.M.L.J.
Represented By
Matthew Lee Schneider
Matthew L. Schneider Law Firm
contact info
Petitioner
Antonia Glenda Johnson
Represented By
Courtney Jennifer Leathers Allen
Epstein Patierno, LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Duane Johnson
Represented By
Courtney Jennifer Leathers Allen
Epstein Patierno, LLP
contact info
Respondent
Garfield Johnson
Represented By
Stephen B. Baumgartner
Baumgartner Law, LLC
contact info
Respondent
Jelena Johnson
Represented By
Stephen B. Baumgartner
Baumgartner Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, April 25, 2023
66 66 order Order Tue 04/25 12:27 PM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on its Order Denying Verified Petition for the Immediate Return of the Minor Child to Petitioners in the Bahamas64 . Upon further consideration, the Court finds it is in the public interest to not have this Order restricted. Accordingly, the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to un-restrict the Court's Order64 in this matter. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/25/2023. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
Related: [-]