Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Schmehl
Case #: 5:22-cv-03034
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2022
Terminated:Jan 05, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jan 29, 2023 3:47 AM EST
Defendant
CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP.
Represented By
RICHARD J. PERR
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
MONICA M. LITTMAN
Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RAINA LEWANDOWSKI
Represented By
JORDAN M. KURTH
The Litigation Practice Group, P.C.
contact info
Unrepresented Party
CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P.
1900 W. LITTLETON BLVD.
LITTLETON, CO 80120


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, January 05, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Thu 01/05 3:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JEFFREY L. SCHMEHL ON 1/5/23. 1/5/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bac)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 30, 2022
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 09/30 2:21 PM
NOTICE by RAINA LEWANDOWSKI of Settlement (KURTH, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/08 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MONICA M. LITTMAN on behalf of CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP. with Certificate of Service(LITTMAN, MONICA)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/08 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD J. PERR on behalf of CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP. with Certificate of Service(PERR, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/23 10:00 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAINA LEWANDOWSKI re: Derek Minto, Firefly Legal, Inc. served Summons and Complaint upon CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P., CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP. by Summons in Civil Action and Complaint. CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, L.P. served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022; CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP. served on 8/16/2022, answer due 9/6/2022. (KURTH, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/09 4:16 PM
ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONEDCASE IS MAGISTRATE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 8/9/22. 8/9/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED TO UNREP.(er) Modified on 8/9/2022 (er)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 08/02 4:21 PM
Summons Issued as to CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES, LP. Forwarded To: Counsel on 8/2/22. (er)
Related: [-]
2 2 trial Exhibit Tue 08/02 2:19 PM
EXHIBIT - Designation Form by RAINA LEWANDOWSKI.. (KURTH, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Tue 08/02 12:58 PM
COMPLAINT against CAPITAL MANAGEMENT SERVICE, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16083047.), filed by Raina Lewandowski.(KURTH, JORDAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Supplement
misc Attorney Required Forms Tue 08/02 1:53 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. Defendant's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED Designation Form in this case using the Exhibit docket event. (sbt)
Related: [-]