Iowa Northern District Court
Judge:Cj Williams
Referred: Mark A Roberts
Case #: 1:22-cv-00078
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2022
Terminated:Feb 22, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 29, 2023 3:00 AM CST
Amicus
Amici Professors of Psychology and Human Development
Represented By
Asaf Orr
National Center For Lesbian Rights
contact info
Laura May Schultes
Rsh Legal
contact info
Amicus
Iowa Safe Schools
P.O. Box 704
Des Moines, IA 50303
Represented By
Rita Bettis Austen
Aclu Of Iowa
contact info
Lisa Nowlin-Sohl
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Amicus
One Iowa
950 Office Park Rd, Suite 240
West Des Moines, IA 50265
Represented By
Rita Bettis Austen
Aclu Of Iowa
contact info
Lisa Nowlin-Sohl
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
contact info
Defendant
Shannon Bisgard
in his official capacity as Superintendent 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Barry L Buchholz
in their official capacity as a member of the Linn Marr Community School District School Board 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Linn-Mar Community School District
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Brittania Morey
in their official capacity as a member of the Linn Marr Community School District School Board 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Sondra Nelson
in their official capacity as a member of the Linn Marr Community School District School Board 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Matt Rollinger
in their official capacity as a member of the Linn Marr Community School District School Board 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Walker
in their official capacity as a member of the Linn Marr Community School District School Board 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Rachel Wall
in their official capacity as a member of the Linn Marr Community School District School Board 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Clark Weaver
in their official capacity as a member of the Linn Marr Community School District School Board 2999 N. Tenth St.
Marion, IA 52302
Represented By
Emily Ann Kolbe
Ahlers & Cooney
contact info
Miriam Deborah Van Heukelem
Ahlers & Cooney, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Parents Defending Education
4532 Lee Hwy #119
Arlington, VA 22207
Represented By
J Michael Connolly
Consovoy Mccarthy PLLC
contact info
James F Hasson
contact info
Alan Ostergren
Alan Ostergren
contact info

GPO Sep 20 2022
junction. Signed by Judge CJ Williams on 9/20/2022. (jag)MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Parents Defending Education. The Court writes to provide a more detailed reasoning of its decision finding against plaintiff's motion for a preliminary in

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, February 22, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/22 8:39 AM
***Civil Case Terminated57 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. (mmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
57 57 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 02/21 8:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Parents Defending Education (Connolly, J)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement