California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Pedro V Castillo
Case #: 2:22-cv-05333
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2022
Terminated:Aug 04, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jan 28, 2023 1:19 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Jacqueline Ponder
2037 Westwood Court No 86
Lancaster, CA 93536
Defendant
Johnetta Ponder
2037 Westwood Court No 86
Lancaster, CA 93536
Plaintiff
Westwood Park, Ltd.
Represented By
Enoch Nathan Cheung
Wallace Richardson Sontag And Le LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, August 25, 2022
11 11 misc Receipt Thu 08/25 12:25 PM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal- Remand to Superior Court (rolm)
Related: [-]
textonly Text Only Bounced Notice of Electronic Filing E-mail Thu 08/25 4:33 PM
Notice of Electronic Filing re Receipt11 e-mailed to Enoch Cheung bounced due to No longer with firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
10 10 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Mon 08/08 11:41 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
9 9 order Remand Case to State Court Mon 08/08 11:38 AM
ORDER REMANDING ACTION AND DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. IT IS ORDERED that this case is REMANDED to the Superior Courtof California, County of Los Angeles, forthwith.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs is DENIED as moot. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 08/02 2:52 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 08/02 11:04 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 08/02 11:04 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 08/02 11:03 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 08/02 11:01 AM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Jacqueline Ponder, Johnetta Ponder. (ghap)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/02 11:00 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by defendant Johnetta Ponder. (ghap)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 08/02 10:58 AM
APPLICATION to Proceed In District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed by defendant Jacqueline Ponder. (ghap)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 08/02 10:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for County of Los Angeles, case number 22AVUD00318 with CONFORMED FILED copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Pedro V Castillo., filed by defendants Jacqueline Ponder, Johnetta Ponder. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-71
answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/02 11:08 AM
NON CONFORM COPY OF ANSWER to Notice of Removal,1 filed by Defendants Jacqueline Ponder, Johnetta Ponder. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A)(ghap)
Related: [-]