Original Case: 5:21-cv-00049

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv.pr-01814
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2022
Terminated:Jan 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 08, 2025 5:00 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
SUSAN EVANS, former Board Member, in her individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TRUDY PRICE-ONEIL, Editor of Enloe newspaper, in her individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GEORGE BARILICH, 2016 Student Council Election Advisor and current Enloe teacher, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MONICA SAWYER, Asst. Principal of Enloe High School, in her individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT LYONS, former Principal of Enloe and current Principal of Heritage High School, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RODNEY TRICE, Assistant Superintendent for Equity Affairs, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DANNY BARNES, former Area Superintendent, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARVIN CONNELLY, former Chief of Staff, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CATHY MOORE, former Deputy Superintendent for School Performance and current Superintendent, in her individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES MERRILL, former Superintendent, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN HILL, former Board Member, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BILL FLETCHER, former Board Member, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TOM BENTON, former Board Member, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LINDSAY MAHAFFEY, current Board Member
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MONIKA JOHNSON-HOSTLER, current Board Member
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROXIE CASH, current Board Member
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES MARTIN, current Board Member
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTINE KUSHNER, current Board Member
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KEITH SUTTON, current Board Member
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WAKE COUNTY BOARD OF EDUCATION
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WAKE COUNTY PUBLIC SCHOOL SYSTEM, WCPSS
Represented By
Stephen Grayson Rawson
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Neal Andrew Ramee
THARRINGTON SMITH LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
DAVINA RICKETTS
Represented By
Davina Ricketts
contact info

GPO Jan 07 2025
PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00049-FL. [1001698325] [22-1814]

Docket last updated: 01/08/2025 4:59 AM EST
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
1 1 2 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00049-FL. Case manager: REdwards. [1001204643] 22-1814 RE [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:28 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 FEE NOTICE issued to Davina Ricketts - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 09/01/2022. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00049-FL. Mailed to: Davina RIcketts and Neal Ramee. [1001204650] 22-1814 RE [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:30 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs fee notice
Att: 2 6 pgs IFP Form
3 3 12 pgs INFORMAL BRIEFING ORDER filed. Mailed to: Davina Ricketts and Neal Ramee. [1001204653] Informal Opening Brief due 08/26/2022 Informal response brief, if any: 14 days after informal opening brief served. 22-1814 RE [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:31 AM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ASSEMBLED ELECTRONIC RECORD docketed. Originating case number: 5:21-cv-00049-FL. Record in folder? Yes. Record reviewed? Yes. PSR & SOR included? N/A. [1001204658] 22-1814 RE [Entered: 08/02/2022 11:33 AM]
Related: [-]