Original Case: 3:21-cv-00051

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:22-cv-05661
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2022
Terminated:Apr 12, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Apr 13, 2023 3:29 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
DLJ PROPERTIES, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Taylor
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHERYL L. JONES
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Taylor
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ELIZABETH JONES
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Taylor
contact info
Plaintiff
IDANIS I. GARCIA MORALES
Plaintiff - Appellant
EDGAR R. RIVERA DE JESUS
Represented By
Edgar R. Rivera De Jesus
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/13/2023 3:29 AM CDT
Tuesday, August 02, 2022
The case manager for this case is: Robin L. Baker (RLB)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant Edgar R. Rivera De Jesus. Transcript needed: y. (RLB)
Related: [-]