Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:22-bk-35311

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Cecelia G Morris
Case #: 4:22-ap-09018
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2022
Terminated:Nov 02, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rocco Garbellano, III
48 Clark Street
Poughkeepsie, NY 12601
Represented By
Rocco Garbellano, III
contact info
Plaintiff
Burton W Wiand, as Receiver for OASIS INTERNATIONAL GROUP, LTD.; OASIS MANAGEMENT, LLC; and SATELLITE HOLDINGS COMPANY
Represented By
Camille J Iurillo
Englander And Fischer, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/02 3:34 PM
Adversary Case 4:22-ap-9018 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
15 15 misc Transcript Tue 11/01 2:12 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/11/2022 at 9:43am RE: Response to Motion Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt; et al. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/30/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/9/2022. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/2/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/30/2023. (Garcia, Pedro)
Related: [-] 10
Monday, October 24, 2022
14 14 order Order, Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Mon 10/24 5:04 PM
Order Dismissing and Closing Adversary Proceeding signed on 10/24/2022. (DuBois, Linda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 10/12 12:30 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Pre Trial Conference; hearing held; MOOT; case dismissed. (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 10/12 12:32 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated RE: Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III; hearing held, motion MOOT; case dismissed. (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 10, 2022
13 13 ans Statement Mon 10/10 12:19 PM
Statement of Rule 26(f) Joint Report and Discovery Plan filed by Camille J Iurillo on behalf of Burton W Wiand. (Iurillo, Camille)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 09, 2022
12 12 answer Reply Sun 10/09 12:49 PM
Reply to Motion / Plainitff's Opposiiton to Motioon to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 05, 2022
11 11 ans Statement Wed 10/05 2:25 PM
Statement of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7026 and Fed. R. Civil P. 26(a) filed by Camille J Iurillo on behalf of Burton W Wiand. (Iurillo, Camille)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
10 10 answer Response Tue 10/04 2:05 PM
Response to Motion Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Debt Related [+] filed by Camille J Iurillo on behalf of Burton W Wiand. (Iurillo, Camille)
Related: [-] 5
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Default Judgment
Friday, September 30, 2022
9 9 answer Statement Fri 09/30 12:49 PM
Statement of Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/25 1:26 PM
Certificate of Service for Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-] 7
7 7 notice Notice, Hearing Thu 08/25 12:56 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III. with hearing to be held on 10/11/2022 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
6 6 16 pgs answer Memorandum of Law Thu 08/25 12:53 PM
Memorandum of Law in support of Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Motion, Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 08/25 12:45 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III. with hearing to be held on 10/11/2022 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM) (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Complaint and exhibits
Att: 2 Exhibit B Docket
Att: 3 Exhibit C Proposed Order
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
4 4 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 08/16 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Anne J. Penachio on behalf of Rocco Garbellano III. (Penachio, Anne)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/12 4:13 PM
Certificate of Service for Complaint and Summons Related [+] filed by Camille J Iurillo on behalf of Burton W Wiand. (Iurillo, Camille)
Related: [-] 2 ,1
Thursday, August 04, 2022
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Thu 08/04 4:03 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/11/2022 at 09:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (CGM), Answer due by 9/6/2022, (Ashmeade, Vanessa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 08/03 9:25 AM
Adversary case 22-09018 Complaint against Rocco Garbellano III (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Filed by Camille J Iurillo on behalf of Burton W Wiand. (Iurillo, Camille)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - DOC 613 Judgment in a Civil Case Rocco Garbellano
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - DOC 1 - Complaint WITH ALL EXHIBITS 1-1 thru 1-6 (Garbellano)
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - DOC 1070 - Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition re (Garbellano) - EF 10.28.2021
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Anile Plea Agreement
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Anile Judgment
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Anile DOJ Announcement
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - DaCorta Verdict
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - DaCorta DOJ Announcement
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - Garbellano, Rocco Transactions
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10 - DOC 1016-1 - Declaration of Jared J. Perez
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11 - NFA Correspondence
Att: 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12 - Settlement Agreement
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 - DOC 1100-1 - Exhibit A - NOF - Garbellano Broker Application with Oasis - EF 02.02.2022