Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Solomon Oliver, Jr
Case #: 1:22-cv-01377
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2022
Terminated:Dec 18, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 31, 2023 4:03 AM EST
Counter-Claimant
McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA
Represented By
Daniel A. Richards
Weston Hurd - Cleveland
contact info
Mark F. Kruse
Weston Hurd - Cleveland
contact info
Counter-Defendant
WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC
Represented By
John C. Hansberry
Fox Rothschild - Pittsburgh
contact info
Counter-Defendant
WFG National Title Insurance Company
Represented By
John C. Hansberry
Fox Rothschild - Pittsburgh
contact info
Defendant
McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA
1111 Superior Ave Suite 2700
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Daniel A. Richards
Weston Hurd - Cleveland
contact info
Mark F. Kruse
Weston Hurd - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC
Represented By
John C. Hansberry
Fox Rothschild - Pittsburgh
contact info
Plaintiff
WFG National Title Insurance Company
Represented By
John C. Hansberry
Fox Rothschild - Pittsburgh
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, December 18, 2023
33 33 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 12/18 11:52 AM
Stipulation and Order of Case Dismissal with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and expenses of litigation. The court will continue jurisdiction for a period of 6 months. Related document32 . Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/18/2023. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
32 32 notice Notice of Dismissal Thu 12/14 2:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC, WFG National Title Insurance Company. (Hansberry, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
order Order on Motion to extend deadlines Tue 10/24 10:40 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's31 Motion to Extend Deadlines for Expert Reports and Discovery Cut-Off. Please confirm whether the parties have settled this case and will be submitting a dismissal entry. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 10/24/2023.(R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 29, 2023
31 31 motion Extension (of deadlines) Tue 08/29 10:49 AM
Motion for extension of Expert Reports and Discovery Cut-Off filed by Defendant McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. Related document(s)14 . (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
30 30 service Subpoena Returned Executed Wed 08/09 3:17 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon First Republic Bank LLC by Personal Service on 07/21/2023 filed on behalf of McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 03, 2023
29 29 service Subpoena Returned Executed Thu 08/03 12:24 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon Fay Servicing, LLC by Personal Service on 7/20/23 filed on behalf of McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
28 28 service Subpoena Returned Executed Thu 08/03 12:22 PM
Subpoena Returned Executed; served upon 304 25th Ave S LLC by Personal Service on 7/24/2023 filed on behalf of McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 20, 2023
27 27 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Thu 07/20 8:40 AM
Notice of Service of Subpoenas filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA.(Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena,
Att: 2 Exhibit Subpoena,
Att: 3 Exhibit Subpoena
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 07/11 10:31 AM
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] re26 Motion for conference/hearing on discovery dispute. The court has been notified by counsel for the Defendant that the parties have reached a tentative resolution of the dispute and a teleconference is no longer required at this juncture. The parties shall notify the court by 7/14/2023 if the telephone conference will need to be reset. Related document(s)26 . (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
order Order on Motion for conference Fri 06/30 2:36 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for Telephone Conference Regarding Discovery Dispute Related [+]. A Telephone Conference is set for 7/11/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be issued separately. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 6/30/2023. (R,Sh)
Related: [-] 26
Friday, June 23, 2023
26 26 notice Notice (atty event) Fri 06/23 9:56 AM
Request for Telephone Conference Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA.(Richards, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Mark Kruse
Friday, June 16, 2023
25 25 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Fri 06/16 3:35 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery to Plaintffs filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
order Order Wed 05/31 1:31 PM
Order [non-document]. The Court's effort to resolve the parties' dispute through a mediator's proposal, see ECF No.22 , was unsuccessful. Should the parties wish to pursue mediation again, they are encouraged to contact the court directly (Grimes_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov). Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 05/31/23. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
24 24 minutes Telephone Conference MJ Thu 05/25 9:59 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Telephone Conference held on 05/24/23 with John C. Hansberry, counsel for the Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant, in preparation for the mediation scheduled for May 24, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Telephone Conference MJ Thu 05/25 9:58 AM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Telephone Conference held on 05/24/23 with Mark F. Kruse, counsel for the Defendant/Counter-Claimant, in preparation for the mediation scheduled for May 24, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
22 22 minutes Mediation Conference Wed 05/24 5:07 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Mediation Conference held on 5/24/2023. Present were Plaintiff WFGs representative Chris Brink with counsel John C. Hansberry and Defendants representative David Schaefer and its insurance carrier representatives Frederick Hunker and James Davidson with counsel Mark F. Kruse. The parties are instructed to separately e-mail the Court (Grimes_Chambers@ohnd.uscourts.gov) by 5/30/2023 at 5 p.m. regarding whether their client accepts or rejects the mediator settlement proposal that will be separately provided to the parties by email. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Discovery Hearing Wed 05/24 4:55 PM
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] The parties resolved their discovery dispute. By June 7, Plaintiffs will file in the appropriate format their response to Interrogatory 5 and Requests for Admission 24, and 7, and will formally supplement their response to Interrogatory 6. By May 31, Plaintiffs will respond to Defendants concern about Plaintiffs response to Interrogatories 7 and 8. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
oth_evt Notice of Hearing or Conference Tue 05/23 12:52 PM
Notice [non-document]. Due to the court's unexpected unavailability on 5/17/2023, the Discovery Telephone Conference did not go forward. The parties have since advised that discovery issues have since been significantly narrowed, if not resolved, at this time. Should any discovery issues remain, the parties will address these at the Mediation Conference scheduled before Magistrate Judge Grimes on 5/24/2023. Related document19 . (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
order Order on Motion for leave Fri 05/12 2:24 PM
Order [non-document] granting the Defendant's motion for leave, Doc.20 . Representative for Defendant's insurance carrier Cyberlock Lawyer may appear for the May 24, 2023 mediation conference remotely. Please note the Court's preference for participation via video rather than telephone. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 05/12/23.(M,MT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
20 20 motion Leave Wed 05/10 4:20 PM
Motion for leave for One of Two Insurance Company Representatives to Attend Mediation Remotely filed by Defendant McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for conference Wed 05/10 10:34 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for Conference regarding Discovery Dispute Related [+] A Telephone Conference is set for 5/17/2023 at 03:00 PM before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be issued separately. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 5/10/2023.(R,Sh)
Related: [-] 19
Monday, May 08, 2023
19 19 motion Conference/Hearing Mon 05/08 9:55 AM
Motion for conference/hearing Regarding Discovery Dispute Pursuant to Loc.R. 37.1 filed by Defendant McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA.(Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Declaration of Mark F. Kruse
Thursday, February 16, 2023
18 18 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Thu 02/16 3:15 PM
Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and Requests for Admissions filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 25, 2023
17 17 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Wed 01/25 4:40 PM
Initial Disclosures filed by WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC, WFG National Title Insurance Company. (Hansberry, John)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Initial Disclosures (atty event) Wed 01/25 12:14 PM
Initial Disclosures Defendant's Initial Disclosures Under F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1)(A) filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
15 15 4 pgs order Order Wed 01/25 9:28 AM
Order scheduling mediation conference to be held on 5/24/2023 at 10:00 AM in Chambers 11A before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 01/25/23. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 19, 2023
14 14 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Order of Referral to Judicial Officer for Mediation or Settlement Thu 01/19 11:56 AM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery is due by 10/15/2023. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 3/20/2023. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/20/2024. The deadline for expert reports for the party with the burden of proof is 9/1/2023. The deadline for rebuttal expert reports is 10/1/2023. The cut-off for expert depositions is 12/1/2023. This case is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr., to conduct mediation as soon as possible after April 15, 2023. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 1/19/2023. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
13 13 oth_ans Answer Thu 01/19 10:23 AM
Answer to Counterclaim filed by WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC, WFG National Title Insurance Company. Related document(s)8 . (Hansberry, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
12 12 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Tue 01/17 10:26 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - filed by WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC, WFG National Title Insurance Company. Related document(s)11 .(Hansberry, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 12, 2023
11 11 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Thu 01/12 4:35 PM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Defendant's Proposed - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 01, 2022
10 10 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Package Issued by Courtroom Deputy Thu 12/01 10:30 AM
Magistrate Consent Package issued. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Thu 12/01 10:29 AM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/17/2023 at 02:30 PM telephonically before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Dial-in information will be issued separately. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/1/2022. (R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 07, 2022
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Fri 10/07 2:58 PM
Defendant McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA's Answer to1 Complaint,, and , Counterclaim against All Plaintiffs filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 06, 2022
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Thu 10/06 3:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
6 6 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Mon 09/26 3:19 PM
Attorney Appearance by Daniel A. Richards filed by on behalf of McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (Richards, Daniel)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Mon 09/26 9:50 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendants'5 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 7, 2022 to answer Complaint . McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA answer due 10/7/2022. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/26/2022.(R,Sh)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
5 5 motion Extension (answer complaint) Fri 09/23 12:55 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 7, 2022 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. Related document(s)1 . (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 14, 2022
oth_evt Reassignment of Magistrate Judge - MJ Grimes Docket Creation Wed 09/14 2:23 PM
Reassignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to General Order 2022-16. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (S,HR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 09/01 10:46 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's4 Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 23, 2022 to answer Complaint . The McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA is answer due 9/23/2022. Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/1/2022. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 31, 2022
4 4 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 08/31 2:36 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until September 23, 2022 to answer Complaint filed by Defendant McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. Related document(s)1 . (Kruse, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Mon 08/15 1:40 PM
Return of Service by personal service executed upon McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA on 8/12/2022, filed on behalf of WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC; WFG National Title Insurance Company Related document(s)2 ,1 . (Hansberry, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 08/05 8:35 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form,
Att: 2 Corrected Summons
Thursday, August 04, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/04 4:13 PM
Complaint against McCarthy Lebit Crystal & Liffman Co., LPA. Filing fee paid $402, Receipt number AOHNDC-11553652. Filed by WFG National Title Company of Washington, LLC; WFG National Title Insurance Company. (Hansberry, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Thu 08/04 4:37 PM
Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr assigned to case. (F,AW)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Thu 08/04 4:38 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker. (F,AW)
Related: [-]