Member Case
Lead case is: 9:22-bk-15739

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mindy A Mora
Case #: 9:22-bk-16046
Case Filed:Aug 04, 2022
Claims Deadline:Oct 13, 2022
Terminated:Sep 12, 2023

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Just Believe Recovery Center, LLC.
1802 NE Jensen Beach Blvd
Jensen Beach, FL 34957-7234
Represented By
Craig I Kelley
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Thursday, September 14, 2023
104 104 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/15 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 102 Final Decree . (Montygierd, Hebe)
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
103 103 court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 09/12 1:57 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-]
102 102 order Final Decree [Order] [Chapter 11] Tue 09/12 1:56 PM
Final Decree . (Montygierd, Hebe)
Related: [-]