Hodges v. Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J Campbell Barker |
Referred: | K Nicole Mitchell |
Case #: | 6:22-cv-00305 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 2:53 AM CST |
Defendant
Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hillary Hodges
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 45 minutes ago |
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
utility
Remark
Mon 11/14 11:27 AM
Civil action dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and11 joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. (ndc) |
||
Thursday, November 10, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc..(White, Whitney) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 12, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER STAYING DEADLINES re9 Notice of Settlement filed by Hillary Hodges. The parties or their counsel shall submit to the Court all documents necessary for the closing of this case on or before November 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/12/2022. (gsm) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by Hillary Hodges(Halvorsen, Joel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, August 24, 2022 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 08/24 9:07 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. to 9/20/2022. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( wea, ) |
||
Tuesday, August 23, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. (White, Whitney) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc..( White, Whitney) |
|
6 | 6
![]() ***DEFICIENT FILING. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc..(White, Whitney) Modified on 8/23/2022 (wea, ) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
notice
Notice of Deficiency
Tue 08/23 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding6 Motion for Extension submitted by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. Incorrect docketing event. To be refiled using the form Application for Extension. (wea, ) |
||
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ORDER DESIGNATING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The court designates Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell to the full extent authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 8/11/2022. (wea, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hillary Hodges. Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Halvorsen, Joel) |
|
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 08/08 10:05 AM
District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (gsm) |
||
Friday, August 05, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
![]() SUMMONS Issued as to Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. (ndc) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9055730.), filed by Hillary Hodges.(Halvorsen, Joel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |