Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Referred: K Nicole Mitchell
Case #: 6:22-cv-00305
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Terminated:Nov 14, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 2:53 AM CST
Defendant
Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc.
Represented By
Whitney L White
Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel - Dallas
contact info
Plaintiff
Hillary Hodges
Represented By
Joel Spencer Halvorsen
Halvorsen Klote
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, November 14, 2022
utility Remark Mon 11/14 11:27 AM
Civil action dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and11 joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 10, 2022
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/10 7:51 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc..(White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 12, 2022
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 09/12 4:29 PM
ORDER STAYING DEADLINES re9 Notice of Settlement filed by Hillary Hodges. The parties or their counsel shall submit to the Court all documents necessary for the closing of this case on or before November 11, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 9/12/2022. (gsm)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 09/12 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Hillary Hodges(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 24, 2022
text Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Wed 08/24 9:07 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. to 9/20/2022. 21 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( wea, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 23, 2022
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/23 6:36 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. (White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
7 7 text Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint Tue 08/23 5:21 PM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc..( White, Whitney)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/23 1:00 PM
***DEFICIENT FILING. PLEASE DISREGARD.*** Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc..(White, Whitney) Modified on 8/23/2022 (wea, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 08/23 2:18 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency regarding6 Motion for Extension submitted by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. Incorrect docketing event. To be refiled using the form Application for Extension. (wea, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
5 5 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/11 2:01 PM
ORDER DESIGNATING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The court designates Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell to the full extent authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1) to handle all pretrial matters in this case, including dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 8/11/2022. (wea, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 08/10 6:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hillary Hodges. Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. served on 8/9/2022, answer due 8/30/2022. (Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 08/08 10:05 AM
District Judge J. Campbell Barker added. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/05 11:38 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. (ndc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/05 11:14 AM
COMPLAINT And Jury Demand against Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9055730.), filed by Hillary Hodges.(Halvorsen, Joel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet