New York Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew L Carter, Jr
Referred: Barbara C Moses
Case #: 1:22-cv-06668
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 3:56 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Suracy Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By
Michael S. Amato
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Michael D. Brown
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Counter Defendant
United Methodist Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By
Ryan Michael Long
Primmer Piper Eggleston & Cramer PC
contact info
Gary Franklin
Primmer Piper Eggleston & Cramer PC
contact info
Defendant
Suracy Insurance Agency, Inc.
6001 Cochran Road, Ste 402
Cleveland, OH 44114
Represented By
Brian Passarelle
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Michael S. Amato
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Michael D. Brown
Ruskin Moscou Faltischek, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
United Methodist Insurance Company, Inc.
30 Main Street, Suite 500
Burlington, VT 05401
Represented By
Ryan Michael Long
Primmer Piper Eggleston & Cramer PC
contact info
Gary Franklin
Primmer Piper Eggleston & Cramer PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 03, 2025
112 112 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/03 3:35 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Suracy Insurance Agency, Inc. and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by United Methodist Insurance Company, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Franklin, Gary)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Fri 01/03 8:54 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Gary Franklin. RE-FILE Document No. 111 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
111 111 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/02 12:05 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by United Methodist Insurance Company, Inc.. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Franklin, Gary)
Related: [-]