Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Nicholas P Mizell
Case #: 2:22-cv-00477
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Terminated:Nov 02, 2022
Case in other court:County Court of the Twentieth Judicial Circuit, 11-2022-CC-001098
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By
Jason Daniel Joffe
Squire Patton Boggs (us), LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Swink
Represented By
Thomas Jon-William Bellinder
Bellinder Law Firm
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
LoanDepot
Terminated: 08/16/2022


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
22 22 misc Judgment Wed 01/04 8:20 AM
JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (JK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 02, 2022
order *Order no pdf Wed 11/02 5:19 PM
TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Pending Settlement. (Doc. 20.) Accordingly, pursuant to Local Rule 3.09(b), this case is DISMISSED without prejudice subject to the right of either party within sixty (60) days of this Order or upon the expiration of a later date established by the Court to move to reopen the case for entry of a stipulated final order or judgment or upon good cause shown for further proceedings. If no party files an appropriate paper on or before 1/3/2023, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to dismiss the action with prejudice and enter final judgment accordingly without further notice. The Clerk of Court is now DIRECTED to terminate any pending deadlines and motions and administratively close the file. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 11/2/2022. (WJF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
20 20 notice Notice of settlement Tue 11/01 3:20 PM
NOTICE of settlement - Pending as to Defendant Equifax by Richard Swink (Bellinder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
order Order Tue 11/01 3:13 PM
TEXT ORDER: Defendant Equifax has failed to timely respond to the complaint. (See Doc. 15). Plaintiff had 28 days to move for clerk's default. Local Rule 1.10(b). But plaintiff has not done so. Therefore, by November 14, 2022, plaintiff will either move for clerk's default or show cause, in writing, why the claims against defendant Equifax should not be dismissed due to plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/1/2022. (BB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 17, 2022
18 18 order Case Management / FLSA / ADA / Social Security / Scheduling Order Wed 08/17 1:38 PM
FCRA FAST-TRACK SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/17/2022. (JGG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
order *Order no pdf Tue 08/16 5:04 PM
TEXT ORDER. Plaintiff has filed a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice against Defendant Loan Depot. (Doc. 16.) The Notice is self-executing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); Matthews v. Gaither , 902 F.2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990) (per curiam). Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Defendant Loan Depot. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 8/16/2022. (NM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Mon 08/15 9:10 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Richard Swink (Bellinder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 12, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/12 10:25 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 12 defendant Equifax's unopposed motion for more time. By September 12, 2022, Equifax must respond to 3 the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/12/2022. (BB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
14 14 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 08/10 4:35 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Equifax Information Services LLC. Related case(s): No (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 08/10 4:35 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/10 4:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re3 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Removal Wed 08/10 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Amended Notice of Removal from County Court, Twentieth Judicial Circuit, Collier County, FL, case number 11-2022-CC-001098 filed in State Court on June 1, 2022. filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Ex. B - State Court Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Notice of Consent to Removal,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
10 10 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Tue 08/09 10:54 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Thomas Jon-William Bellinder on behalf of Richard Swink. Lead Counsel: Thomas J. Bellinder. (Bellinder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/09 10:31 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Richard Swink. (Bellinder, Thomas) Modified as to docket text on 8/9/2022 (JK)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of a Related Action Tue 08/09 10:26 AM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Richard Swink. Related case(s): No (Bellinder, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons returned executed Tue 08/09 10:19 AM
RETURN of service as to State Court executed on 7/21/2022 by Richard Swink as to Equifax Information Services LLC. (Bellinder, Thomas) Modified as to docket text on 8/9/2022 (JK)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons returned executed Tue 08/09 10:19 AM
RETURN of service as to State Court executed on 7/15/2022 by Richard Swink as to LoanDepot. (Bellinder, Thomas) Modified as to docket text on 8/9/2022 (JK)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 08, 2022
4 4 order Civil Action Order Mon 08/08 10:47 AM
CIVIL Action Order Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/8/2022. (JK)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Mon 08/08 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (JK)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
3 3 cmp Complaint Mon 08/08 10:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services LLC, LoanDepot with Jury Demand filed by Richard Swink. Filed in State Court 06/01/2022.(JK)
Related: [-]
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-477-JLB-NPM. (SJB)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 08/05 3:39 PM
COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from County Court, Twentieth Judicial Circuit, Collier County, FL, case number 11-2022-CC-001098 filed in State Court on June 1, 2022. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19854394 filed by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Joffe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents Ex. B - State Court Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Notice of Consent to Removal,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/05 4:11 PM
NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John L. Badalamenti and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:22-cv-477-JLB-NPM. (SJB)
Related: [-]