New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Eric R Komitee
Referred: Anne Y Shields
Case #: 2:22-cv-04628
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Terminated:Feb 17, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By
Kelly Marie Cardin
Ogletree Deakins
contact info
Jessica Rose Schild
Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Sanger
Represented By
Yitzchak Kopel
Bursor & Fisher P.A.
contact info
Alec Mitchell Leslie
Bursor & Fisher, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 17, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 02/17 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Edward Sanger Without Prejudice (Kopel, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/17 11:54 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (AG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 18, 2023
order Scheduling Order Wed 01/18 9:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER re12 Letter filed by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.: In light of the parties' representation that this action has settled, all discovery deadlines are adjourned sine die . The parties are directed to file a stipulation of discontinuance to the assigned District Judge within thirty (30) days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 1/18/2023. (DM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
12 12 misc Letter Tue 01/17 1:48 PM
Letter re: Status by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (Cardin, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 12/14 11:50 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Stay: In light of the parties' representation that the pending mediation has been rescheduled, the stay in effect herein is extended through January 17, 2023. On or before January 18, 2023, counsel are directed to submit a joint letter advising the Court as to the status of this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 12/14/2022. (DM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 13, 2022
11 11 motion Stay Tue 12/13 6:33 PM
Letter MOTION to Stay all Deadlines by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (Cardin, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2022
order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 10/03 3:01 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Stay. In light of counsels' indication that the parties are proceeding with mediation, this case is STAYED through December 20, 2022. On or before December 20, 2022, counsel are directed to submit a joint letter advising the Court as to the status of this case. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 10/3/2022. (DM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
10 10 motion Stay Thu 09/29 11:26 AM
Letter MOTION to Stay All Deadlines by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (Cardin, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 26, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/26 5:17 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: So Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. answer due 10/28/2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/26/2022. (Minerva, Deanna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 25, 2022
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/25 12:28 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.. (Cardin, Kelly)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/25 12:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Rose Schild on behalf of Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Schild, Jessica)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/25 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Marie Cardin on behalf of Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Cardin, Kelly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 18, 2022
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/18 10:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Sanger. Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. served on 8/8/2022, answer due 8/29/2022. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
5 5 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/09 10:08 AM
ORDER: Initial Conference set for 12/12/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields.The parties are directed to call the AT&TTeleconferencing Center at (877) 810-9415 and to enter Access Code9005911 when prompted. See order and attachment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields on 8/9/2022. (Torres, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AYS Rules
Monday, August 08, 2022
4 4 service Summons Issued Mon 08/08 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 08/08 9:28 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 08/08 9:19 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 08/08 9:27 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Jakubowski, Laura)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/05 4:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15819005 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Edward Sanger. (Kopel, Yitzchak)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons