Terran Biosciences, Inc. v. Compass Pathfinder Limited
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen Lipton Hollander |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-01956 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(b) - Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 3:53 AM EST |
Defendant
Compass Pathfinder Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
Terran Biosciences, Inc.
507 W 28th Street PH 3A
New York, NY 10001 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 06 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 2/6/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, March 21, 2024 | ||
104 | 104
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal
Thu 03/21 10:39 AM
ORDER GRANTING97 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 3/20/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
103 | 103
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 03/20 9:09 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re95 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Terran Biosciences, Inc., Scott Thompson, University of Maryland, Baltimore.(Harvey, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
102 | 102
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 03/20 8:58 AM
-SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re95 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint filed by Terran Biosciences, Inc., Scott Thompson, University of Maryland, Baltimore.(Harvey, Andrew) |
|
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 03/20 8:24 AM
QC NOTICE:96 SEALED Motion to Dismiss filed by Terran Biosciences, Inc., University of Maryland, Baltimore, Scott Thompson was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile document under the "Responses and Replies" category and select the "Response in Opposition to Motion" event. The motion has been terminated, marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
||
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 03/20 8:29 AM
QC NOTICE:98 Motion to Dismiss filed by Terran Biosciences, Inc. was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile document under the "Responses and Replies" category and select the "Response in Opposition to Motion" event. The motion has been terminated, marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
99 | 99
2
pgs
misc
Affidavit
Tue 03/19 8:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT Guzior by Terran Biosciences, Inc.(Harvey, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit | ||
98 | 98
40
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 03/19 8:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Terran Biosciences, Inc.(Harvey, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
97 | 97
motion
Seal
Tue 03/19 8:07 PM
MOTION to Seal by Terran Biosciences, Inc.(Harvey, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
96 | 96
motion
Dismiss
Tue 03/19 8:04 PM
-SEALED- MOTION to Dismiss Opposition by Terran Biosciences, Inc., Scott Thompson, University of Maryland, Baltimore(Harvey, Andrew) |