Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Greg Kays
Case #: 4:22-cv-00511
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Terminated:Jul 26, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 3:07 AM CST
Defendant
Neil Clevenger
Defendant
Keith Majors
Defendant
Missouri Office of Public Counsel
Defendant
Missouri Public Service Commission
Defendant
Travis Pringles
Defendant
Raytown Water
Defendant
Raytown Water Board of Directors
Defendant
Unknown Employees of Public Counsel
Defendant
Unknown Employees of the Missouri Public Service Commission
Plaintiff
Blondell F. Mitchell
5918 Agnes Ave.
Kansas City, MO 64130

GPO Dec 20 2023
ORDER denying Plaintiff's pro se 6 motion for default judgment. Plaintiff has 30 days from the entry of this Order to file her complaint and summons request with the Court. Failure to do so will result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. A copy of this Order has been mailed to Plaintiff at 5918 Agnes Ave.Kansas City, MO 64130. Signed on December 20, 2023, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk).
GPO Jul 23 2024
ORDER granting Defendants' motions to dismiss 32, 40, 42. Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. All remaining pro se motions are denied as moot. A copy of this Order was mailed to Plaintiff at 5918 Agnes Ave. Kansas City, MO 64130. Signed on July 23, 2024, by District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk).

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, January 10, 2025
79 79 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 01/10 1:07 PM
MANDATE of US COURT OF APPEALS as to75 Notice of Appeal filed by Blondell F. Mitchell with mandate issued on 01/10/2025. (Terry, Jason)
Related: [-]