California Eastern District Court
Judge:William B Shubb
Referred: Allison Claire
Case #: 2:22-cv-01390
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 1:06 AM PST
Defendant
Tyler Miller
Represented By
Jarrett S. Osborne-Revis
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Joshua Robbins
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Kurt M. Rylander, PHV
Rylander & Associates PC
contact info
Robert Scott McWhorter
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Miller Mendel, Inc.
Represented By
Jarrett S. Osborne-Revis
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Joshua Robbins
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Kurt M. Rylander, PHV
Rylander & Associates PC
contact info
Robert Scott McWhorter
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc.
Represented By
Robert D. Swanson
Boutin Jones Inc.
contact info
Douglas J. Sorocco, PHV
Dunlap Codding, P.C.
contact info
Daniel S. Stouder
Boutin Jones, Inc.
contact info
Ian Keller McGlone
Boutin Jones, Inc
contact info
Evan W. Talley, PHV
Dunlap Codding, P.C.
contact info

GPO Aug 11 2022
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 08/10/22 GRANTING 7 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Douglas J. Sorocco, PHV for Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
GPO Aug 11 2022
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 08/10/22 GRANTING 8 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Evan W. Talley, PHV for Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
GPO Oct 17 2022
ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/17/22 GRANTING 18 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Kurt M. Rylander, PHV for Tyler Miller and Miller Mendel, Inc. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Her, S)
GPO Oct 24 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER adjusting briefing schedule 21 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/24/2022: 1. Plaintiff's deadline to file and serve an opposition brief to each motion is 11/11/2022; 2. Defendants' deadline to file and serve a reply brief in support of each motion is 12/1/2022; and 3. The hearing date for each motion remains 1/9/2023 at 1:30 p.m., as scheduled. (Kirksey Smith, K)
GPO Dec 01 2022
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/30/22 EXTENDING the deadline for MMI's to file and serve reply briefs for its motions to 12/8/22. The hearing date for each motion remains 1/9/23, at 1:30 p.m. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Dec 08 2022
ORDER STAYING CASE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/7/22 DENYING without prejudice defendants' 11 Motion to Strike and 12 Motion to Dismiss, and the hearing on those motions set for 1/9/23, and any other deadlines in this case are VACATED. All proceedings in this case are STAYED pending final adjudication of the validity of the '098 and '188 Patents by the Federal Circuit. The parties shall file a joint status report within 14 days after all proceedings in the Federal Circuit regarding the '098 and '188 Patents have concluded. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Dec 11 2024
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 12/10/2024 LIFTING STAY and setting a Status Conference for 2/24/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb. Parties to file a Joint Status Report 30 days prior to the status conference. (Zignago, K.)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
50 50 misc Transcript Tue 05/06 4:08 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss/Motion to Strike held on 4/28/25, before Senior District Judge William B. Shubb, filed by Court Reporter Abigail Torres, Phone number 916-930-4116 E-mail a.torres.reporting@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction must be filed within 5 court days. Redaction Request due 5/30/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/6/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/4/2025. (Torres, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
49 49 misc Transcript Ordering Form Thu 05/01 9:52 AM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Guardian Alliance Technologies, Inc. for proceedings held on 04/28/2025 before Judge Shubb. Court Reporter Abigail Torres. (Sorocco, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
48 48 order Memorandum, Opinion & Order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Wed 04/30 12:21 PM
MEMORANDUM and ORDER re DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE signed by Senior District Judge William B. Shubb on 4/30/2025: IT IS ORDERED that defendants' motion to strike (Docket No.41 ) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss (Docket No.40 ) be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED only as to the eighth claim for false advertising and eleventh claim for trade libel. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Plaintiff has 14 days from the date of this Order to file an amended complaint, if it can do so consistent with this Order. Within 21 days of the issuance of this Order, the parties shall file a joint status report addressing (1) whether this court should issue a pretrial scheduling order, and if so what dates the parties desire and any other information required under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) (see Docket No.6 ); (2) whether the parties wish to proceed to settlement discussions, and if so whether they would like the court to refer the matter to the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program ("VDRP") or a settlement conference with a magistrate judge; and (3) any other matter of which the parties think the court should be informed. (Deputy Clerk KKS)
Related: [-]