Georgia Southern District Court
Case #: 4:22-cr-00118
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Aug 06, 2022 3:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Bryant Montrais Stubbs (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David H. Estes
U.S. Attorney'S Office-Savannah
contact info
Jennifer Gayle Solari
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Savannah
contact info
Darron J Hubbard
Doj-Usao
contact info
Patricia Green Rhodes
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Augusta
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/06/2022 4:59 AM EDT
Wednesday, August 03, 2022
1 1 6 pgs INDICTMENT as to Bryant Montrais Stubbs (1) count(s) 1-5. (ca) (ca).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/4/2022) Signature page
2 2 PENALTY CERTIFICATION by Government as to Bryant Montrais Stubbs. (ca)
Related: [-]