Original Case: 2:10-cv-02460

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:14-cv-03834
Typecivil / united states as party / other civil
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Case Filed:Sep 11, 2014
Terminated:Oct 09, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Jan 09, 2016 4:24 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Federal Avaition Administration
Represented By
Alan Mattioni
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AGUSTA AEROSPACE CORP
Represented By
Zachary J. Ballard
Salmon, Ricchezza, Singer & Turchi
contact info
John M. Socolow
Pino & Associates
contact info
John E. Salmon
Rawle & Henderson
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, FEDERAL AVIATION ADMINISTRATION
Represented By
Alan Mattioni
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Jill D. Rosa
United States Department of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH N. TURTURRO, Administrator of the Estate of Adam B. Braddock, Deceased
Represented By
Richard E. Genter
The Wolk Law Firm
contact info
Cynthia M. Devers
The Wolk Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARLES ANGELINA, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Anthony Angelina, Deceased.
Plaintiff - Appellant
VIRGINIA ANGELINA, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Charles Anthony Angelina, Deceased.
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH N. TURTURRO, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF ADAM B. BRADDOCK DECEASED
Represented By
Richard E. Genter
The Wolk Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARLES ANGELINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CHARLES ANTHONY ANGELINA, DECEASED
Represented By
Cynthia M. Devers
The Wolk Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
VIRGINIA ANGELINA, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF CHARLES ANTHONY ANGELINA, DECEASED
Represented By
Cynthia M. Devers
The Wolk Law Firm
contact info

GPO Oct 09 2015
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION Coram: SHWARTZ, KRAUSE and GREENBERG, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 22. Judge: GREENBERG Authoring.--[Edited 10/09/2015 by LML to attached corrected opinion showing correct date the district court order was entered on the docket]

Docket last updated: 01/09/2016 4:24 AM EST
Thursday, September 11, 2014
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (PDB)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellants Charles Angelina, Virginia Angelina and Joseph N. Turturro in District Court No. 2-10-cv-02460. (PDB)
Related: [-]