Kansas District Court
Case #: 6:22-mj-06186
Case Filed:Jul 08, 2022
Terminated:Jul 13, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Aug 07, 2022 2:21 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Aaron L. Smith
Office Of United States Attorney - Wichita
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Keith Shazad Malik (1)
Terminated: 07/13/2022
Represented By
Jennifer A. Amyx
Office Of Federal Public Defender - Wichita
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/07/2022 2:39 AM CDT
Friday, July 08, 2022
ARREST (Rule 5(c)(3) Out) of Keith Shazad Malik. (heo)
Related: [-]
ORDER as to Keith Shazad Malik - Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the government is reminded of its obligations pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny to disclose material that is favorable to the defendant and material to defendants guilt or punishment. The failure to do so in a timely manner may include dismissal of the indictment or information, dismissal of individual charges, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/8/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: RULE 5/INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Keith Shazad Malik held on 7/8/2022. Attorney Jennifer A. Amyx, AFPD appointed for defendant. Detention Hearing set for 7/13/2022 at 01:30 PM in Wichita Courtroom 406 (KGG) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Preliminary Hearing will be determined at Detention Hearing. Remanded to custody. (Tape #1:32 - 1:39) (ca)
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Keith Shazad Malik. (ca)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PENDING HEARING PURSUANT TO BAIL REFORM ACT as to Keith Shazad Malik. Detention Hearing set for 7/13/2022 at 01:30 PM in Wichita Courtroom 406 (KGG) before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 7/8/2022. (ca)
Related: [-]