Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:20-bk-10439

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:22-ap-00167
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2022
Terminated:Aug 08, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
STEVEN OWEN DWYER
7200 N SCOTTSDALE ROAD ROOM 8008
PARADISE VALLEY, AZ 85253
Represented By
STEVEN OWEN DWYER
contact info
Defendant
DIANA LYNN DWYER
7200 N SCOTTSDALE ROAD ROOM 8008
PARADISE VALLEY, AZ 85253
Represented By
DIANA LYNN DWYER
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID A. BIRDSELL
216 N. Center
Mesa, AZ 85201
Represented By
DAVID A. BIRDSELL
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM MST
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
14 14 court Return Mail Tue 09/19 10:23 AM
Return Mail For Defendant (JMM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 08/10 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Dismissing Adversary
12 12 order oDismissing Adversary - VAN Form Tue 08/08 1:45 PM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary signed on 8/8/2023 Related [+] . (MAT)
Related: [-] 9 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
court Close Adversary Wed 08/09 8:52 AM
Adversary Terminated . (MAT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 25, 2023
11 11 court Return Mail Tue 07/25 10:48 AM
Return Mail for STEVEN OWEN DWYER and DIANA LYNN DWYER Related [+] (ETS)
Related: [-] 9 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/07 9:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
9 9 order oPotential Dismissal of Adversary - VAN Form Wed 07/05 3:11 PM
ORDER Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary . (RDC)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 23, 2022
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 12/25 10:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerks Entry of Default
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Form Fri 12/23 9:57 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] . (AMS)
Related: [-] 6 Application for Entry of Default
Wednesday, December 21, 2022
6 6 motion Entry of Default (Application for) Wed 12/21 10:57 AM
Trustee Application for Entry of Default filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL Related [+]. (BIRDSELL, DAVID)
Related: [-] 5 Certificate of Mailing
Wednesday, August 10, 2022
5 5 other Certificate of Mailing Wed 08/10 8:03 AM
Trustee Certificate of Mailing Summons & Complaint vs. Debtor (PRO-SE) filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. Related [+] (BIRDSELL, DAVID)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued
Monday, August 08, 2022
4 4 court Summons Issued (Form) Mon 08/08 8:02 AM
Summons Issued . (DMM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 05, 2022
3 3 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 08/05 8:48 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. (BIRDSELL, DAVID)
Related: [-]
2 2 other Certification Fri 08/05 8:47 PM
Trustee Certification of No Funds Available to Pay Adversary Filing Fee filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL. Related [+] (BIRDSELL, DAVID)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/05 8:42 PM
Adversary case 2:22-ap-00167. Complaint (No Fee Due or Fee Deferred) against STEVEN OWEN DWYER, DIANA LYNN DWYER filed by DAVID A. BIRDSELL of GOODMAN LAW PRACTICE PLC on behalf of DAVID A. BIRDSELL Nature of Suit: 41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)) . (BIRDSELL, DAVID)
Related: [-]